Lawrence v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Lawrence
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and First American Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv01224
Filed: August 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Filing 10 OPPOSITION by Robert Lawrence to #5 Motion to Dismiss. (McFarlin, Timothy)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re Joint Stipulation to Extend Plaintiff Robert Lawrence's Deadline to Respond to Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/7/2021. Response to Motion to Dismiss due by 10/6/2021. Reply due by 10/20/2021. (Jessen, A)
September 3, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss FAC Deadline re #5 MOTION to DISMISS by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rapkine, Michael)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/24/2021: As a Motion to Dismiss, document #5 , has been noticed for hearing on 11/9/2021 before the District Judge, the Court vacates the Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2021 before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Within ten days after the ruling on the Motion to Dismiss has been issued, should the case go forward, the parties are directed to contact Courtroom Deputy Michelle Rooney (mrooney@caed.uscourts.gov) to secure a new scheduling conference date. (Text Only Entry)(Rooney, M)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in re #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Rapkine, Michael)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to DISMISS by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before UnassignedDJ. (Rapkine, Michael)
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rapkine, Michael)
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #2 Civil New Case Documents,. (Rapkine, Michael)
August 13, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
August 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Tulare County Superior Court - Porterville, case number PCU285984 by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., First American Title Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9760355) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Declaration of Michael Rapkine)(Rapkine, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lawrence
Represented By: Timothy G. McFarlin
Represented By: Timothy McFarlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?