Enriquez v. Sirius XM Radio, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph Enriquez
Defendant: Sirius XM Radio, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01240
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to REMAND PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO REMAND by Joseph Enriquez. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND)(Allen Pike, Bevin)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/22/2021: In light of the pending motion to dismiss, the Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2021 is CONTINUED to 2/8/2022 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The parties are reminded of their obligation to file a joint scheduling report at least one week prior to the conference. (Text Only Entry) (Hall, S)
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS by Sirius XM Radio, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Norris, Trenton)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Sirius XM Radio, Inc.. (Norris, Trenton)
August 17, 2021 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9767366. (Norris, Trenton)
August 17, 2021 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee (Norris, Trenton)
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Sirius XM Radio, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Norris, Trenton)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2021 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 JLT Worksheet, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Maldonado, C)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Sirius XM Radio, Inc.. (Norris, Trenton)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court, case number BCV-21-101494 by All Plaintiffs.(Filing fee $ 402) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Norris, Trenton)
August 16, 2021 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee (Norris, Trenton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enriquez v. Sirius XM Radio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Enriquez
Represented By: Bevin Elaine Allen Pike
Represented By: Trisha Kathleen Monesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sirius XM Radio, Inc.
Represented By: George F. Langendorf
Represented By: Trenton H. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?