Barrera v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Angel Martin Barrera
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv01326
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CLOSING the Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/28/2021. CASE CLOSED. (Rivera, O)
October 27, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION of DISMISSAL Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by Angel Martin Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order of Dismissal)(Jacobson, Kevin)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AFTER #7 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/9/2021. Stipulated Dismissal due by 12/17/2021. (Hall, S)
September 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Angel Martin Barrera. Dispositional Docs due by 12/9/2021. (Jacobson, Kevin)
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2021 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 JLT Worksheet, #3 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Maldonado, C)
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ford Motor Company (Proudfoot, Matthew)
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
September 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Matthew Millard Proudfoot on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
September 2, 2021 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern, case number BCV-21-101748 by Ford Motor Company. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9799296) (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint - State Court, #2 Answer to Complaint - State Court)(Proudfoot, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrera v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Martin Barrera
Represented By: Kevin Y. Jacobson
Represented By: Athena Bao Nhi Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Matthew Millard Proudfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?