Dickerson v. Aera Energy, LLC
Plaintiff: Aaron Dickerson
Defendant: Aera Energy, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01384
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE RE: REMOVAL by Aera Energy, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Franz, Stephen)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF CLARIFICATION re district judge availability to hear matters in the Eastern District of California. (Jessen, A)
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Aaron Dickerson. (Sutton, S.)
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2021 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 JLT Worksheet, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
September 16, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Aera Energy, LLC. (Mittman, Jeremy)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Aera Energy, LLC (Mittman, Jeremy)
September 16, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Laurie Beaton re #1 Notice of Removal. (Mittman, Jeremy)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Stephen Franz re #1 Notice of Removal. (Mittman, Jeremy)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior COurt, case number BCV-21-101646 by All Defendants.(Mittman, Jeremy)
September 15, 2021 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9820289. (Franz, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickerson v. Aera Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Dickerson
Represented By: Brady Briggs
Represented By: Jared Hague
Represented By: S. Brett Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aera Energy, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy Matthew Mittman
Represented By: Stephen Charles Franz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?