(PC)Calloway v. Youssee et al
Plaintiff: Jamisi Jermaine Calloway
Defendant: A. Youssee, S. Davenport, S. Lopez, M.A. Felder, Doctor M. Spaeth, N. Igbinosa, H. Aziz, I. Patel, Bartulaba, Giwa and H. Azizi
Case Number: 1:2021cv01450
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING #10 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Stay Findings and Recommendations; ORDER ADOPTING #7 Findings and Recommendations Recommending Denial of Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/08/2021. Twenty-One Day Deadline. (Maldonado, C)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order served on Jamisi Jermaine Calloway. (Maldonado, C)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF CLARIFICATION re district judge availability to hear matters in the Eastern District of California. (Lundstrom, T)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order of Clarification served on Jamisi Jermaine Calloway. (Lundstrom, T)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER and PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Jamisi Jermaine Calloway. (Rivera, O)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OBJECTIONS to #7 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS by Plaintiff Jamisi Jermaine Calloway. (Rivera, O)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 be Denied, pursuant to 28:1915(g) and Plaintiff be Ordered to pay the $402.00 initial filing fee in full to proceed with this action re #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ; referred to Judge Unassigned DJ, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/4/2021. (Objections to F&R due 14-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been assigned to UnassignedDJ and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is: 1:21-cv-01450 NONE-BAM (PC). (Martin-Gill, S)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), #6 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Jamisi Jermaine Calloway. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Jamisi Jermaine Calloway (Martin-Gill, S)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Jamisi Jermaine Calloway, CDC P-97743 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Jamisi Jermaine Calloway. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jamisi Jermaine Calloway. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983)PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against H. Aziz, Bartulaba, S. Davenport, M.A. Felder, Giwa, N. Igbinosa, S. Lopez, I. Patel, M. Spaeth, A. Youssee by Jamisi Jermaine Calloway.(Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC)Calloway v. Youssee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamisi Jermaine Calloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Youssee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.A. Felder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor M. Spaeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Igbinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Aziz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bartulaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Azizi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?