Baker v. Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lisa Baker
Defendant: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. and R. Daniel Robinson
Case Number: 1:2021cv01490
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to REMAND by Lisa Baker. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration)(Titus, Michael)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/12/2021: (Text Only Entry) The parties are advised that pursuant to General Order No. 617, addressing the public health emergency posed by the coronavirus (COVID-19) outbreak, all civil motions set for hearing before District Judge Dale A. Drozd will be decided on the papers. The parties should not contact Judge Drozd's chambers to inquire about whether a hearing on a pending motion will be held. If the court determines that a hearing is necessary, the court will issue an order to specially set the motion for hearing by telephone or video conference. In accordance with Judge Drozd's Standing Order in Light of Judicial Emergency in the Eastern District of California, the hearing date selected by the movant will continue to govern the deadlines for opposition and reply briefs pursuant to Local Rule 230(c).(Hernandez, M)
November 10, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Joshua Nathan Kastan. (Kastan, Joshua)
November 10, 2021 Filing 16 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc., R. Daniel Robinson in re #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Saber Label, #2 Exhibit B - Butyrac Label)(Kastan, Joshua)
November 10, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc., R. Daniel Robinson in SUPPORT of #14 Motion to Dismiss. (Kastan, Joshua)
November 10, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to DISMISS by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc., R. Daniel Robinson. Attorney Kastan, Joshua Nathan added. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Kastan, Joshua)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/28/2021: (Text Only Entry) On October 27, 2021, plaintiff filed a #11 first amended complaint in this action. In light of the #11 first amended complaint superseding the #1 original complaint, defendant's [5, 6] motion to dismiss and supporting #7 request for judicial notice are therefore denied as having been rendered moot.(Hernandez, M)
October 28, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *R. Daniel Robinson* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael Charles Titus* *Wild Carter & Tipton* *246 W. Shaw Avenue* *Fresno, CA 93704*. (Jessen, A)
October 27, 2021 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Lisa Baker.(Titus, Michael)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Application for Pro Hac Vice, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/19/2021. Added attorney Nicholas A. Warden, PHV for Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 18, 2021 Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. for attorney Nicholas A. Warden to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-9879151) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Idaho State Bar)(Kastan, Joshua)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/14/2021: (Text Only Entry) The parties are advised that pursuant to General Order No. 617, addressing the public health emergency posed by the coronavirus (COVID-19) outbreak, all civil motions set for hearing before District Judge Dale A. Drozd will be decided on the papers. The parties should not contact Judge Drozd's chambers to inquire about whether a hearing on a pending motion will be held. If the court determines that a hearing is necessary, the court will issue an order to specially set the motion for hearing by telephone or video conference. In accordance with Judge Drozd's Standing Order in Light of Judicial Emergency in the Eastern District of California, the hearing date selected by the movant will continue to govern the deadlines for opposition and reply briefs pursuant to Local Rule 230(c).(Hernandez, M)
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. in re #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Saber Label, #2 Exhibit B - Butyrac Label)(Kastan, Joshua)
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. in SUPPORT of #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Kastan, Joshua)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to DISMISS by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Kastan, Joshua)
October 11, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kastan, Joshua)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/20/2022 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Order re Consent, #4 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.. (Kastan, Joshua)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Merced County Superior Court, case number 21cv-02844 by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9858302) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit A2, #4 Exhibit A3, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Proof of Service)(Kastan, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Baker
Represented By: Michael Charles Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Nathan Kastan
Represented By: Nicholas A. Warden, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Daniel Robinson
Represented By: Joshua Nathan Kastan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?