(HC) Griffin v. Price
Petitioner: Dexter Lawrence Griffin
Respondent: Brandon Price
Case Number: 1:2021cv01516
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Dexter Lawrence Griffin signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/14/2021. (Sant Agata, S)
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Sant Agata, S)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:21-cv-07646.
October 14, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order Authorizing IFP Status served on Dexter Lawrence Griffin. (Sant Agata, S)
October 14, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Dexter Lawrence Griffin. (Sant Agata, S)
October 13, 2021 Transferring case electronically to the Eastern District of California. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2021) [Transferred from cand on 10/14/2021.]
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. The Clerk shall terminate all pending motions and transfer the entire file to the Eastern District of California. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/8/2021. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 10/14/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER'S APPLICATION AND DECLARATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Dexter Lawrence Griffin. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021) [Transferred from cand on 10/14/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for SVPA Speedy Trial filed by Dexter Lawrence Griffin. Responses due by 10/27/2021. Replies due by 11/10/2021. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021) [Transferred from cand on 10/14/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus (no process) against Brandon Price, Warden, (Filing Fee: ifpp entered on 9/29/2021). Filed by Dexter Lawrence Griffin. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibits (part 1), #(2) Exhibits (part 2, #(3) Exhibits (part 3, #(4) Exhibits (part 4), #(5) Envelope)(tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021) [Transferred from cand on 10/14/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Griffin v. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dexter Lawrence Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brandon Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?