(PC) Fratus v. Uchi et al
Plaintiff: John Fratus
Defendant: Uchi and Burnes
Case Number: 1:2021cv01523
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER CLARIFYING NOVEMBER 10, 2021 ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/15/2021. (Copy of this order served on Writ Clerk Sacramento)(Martin-Gill, S)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Order, served on John Fratus. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER to Pay Filing Fee within 45-Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/10/2021. (Case Management Deadline: 45-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on John Fratus. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order, served on John Fratus. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, RTS-Unable to Forward: #7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case sent to John Fratus. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION of Notification regarding Payment of Filing Fee by John Fratus. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE to the Court re Filing Fee, by John Fratus (Martin-Gill, S)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to CSP-LAC, P.O. Box 4670, Lancaster, CA 93539 by John Fratus. (Maldonado, C)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order of Clarification, #7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on John Fratus. (Maldonado, C)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF CLARIFICATION re district judge availability to hear matters in the Eastern District of California. (Lundstrom, T)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order of Clarification served on John Fratus. (Lundstrom, T)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been assigned to UnassignedDJ and Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The new case number is: 1:21-cv-1523 NONE-EPG (PC). (Martin-Gill, S)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on John Fratus. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Reader, L)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay $402.00 Filing Fee within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/19/2021.( Motion for IFP or Pay Filing Fee within 45-Day Deadline) (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(Martin-Gill, S)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, served on John Fratus. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/18/2021 (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Henshaw, R)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:21-cv-1868 JDP) to Fresno (1:21-cv-01523 EPG) signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 10/14/2021(Henshaw, R)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on John Fratus. (Henshaw, R)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/15/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Huang, H)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on John Fratus. (Huang, H)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Burnes, Uchi by John Fratus.(Huang, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Fratus v. Uchi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Fratus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?