Ruiz, Jr. v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Jesus Ruiz, Jr. and Sara Carranza
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv01531
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #27 Joint Request to Continue Deadline to File Dismissal Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/31/2022. Deadline: 01/26/23. (Maldonado, C)
October 28, 2022 Filing 27 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Sara Carranza. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Status Report Regarding the Status of Settlement)(Kalinowski, Daniel)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): On October 7, 2022, the parties filed a notice of settlement in principle of this matter. (Doc. #25 .) Pursuant to Local Rule 160,, this Court ORDERS the parties, no later than October 28, 2022, to file appropriate papers to dismiss or conclude this action in its entirety. This Court VACATES all pending dates and matters. Failure to comply with this order may be grounds for the imposition of sanctions on counsel or parties who contributed to violation of this order. See Local Rule 160 and Local Rule 272. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/11/2022. (Valdez, E)
October 7, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT (Joint) by Sara Carranza. Dispositional Docs due by 1/5/2023. (Kalinowski, Daniel)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion to Substitute Plaintiff signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 06/15/2022. (Flores, E)
June 2, 2022 Filing 23 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Ford Motor Company to #22 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,. (Vilchez, Katherine)
May 18, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Substitute Plaintiff Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.25(a) by Jesus Ruiz, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.25(a), #2 Declaration of Phil A Thomas in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.25(a), #3 Exhibit A, #4 Declaration of Sara Carranza in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.25(a), #5 Exhibit A, #6 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Substitute Plaintiff Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.25(a))(Thomas, Phil)
May 17, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Phil A Thomas on behalf of Jesus Ruiz, Jr.. Attorney Thomas, Phil A added. (Thomas, Phil)
April 26, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Gurpreet Sandhu on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Attorney Sandhu, Gurpreet added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sandhu, Gurpreet)
March 8, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Kamau Edwards on behalf of Jesus Ruiz, Jr.. Attorney Edwards, Kamau added. (Edwards, Kamau)
March 1, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Counsel by Jesus Ruiz, Jr.. (Kalinowski, Daniel)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING ORDER, signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 01/25/2022. (Maldonado, C)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Scheduling Conference Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/20/2022. (Initial Disclosure due by 1/25/2022; Amendment to Pleadings due by 4/1/2022; Non Expert Discovery due by 11/14/2022; Expert Disclosure due by 12/9/2022; Supplemental Expert Disclosure due by 12/22/2022; Expert Discovery due by 2/10/2023; Pretrial Motions filed by 3/3/2023; Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston; Jury Trial (3-5 days) set for 10/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston)(Rosales, O.)
January 20, 2022 Filing 15 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/20/2022.SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held. Order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel Daniel Kalinowski appeared by Zoom video - present. Defendants Counsel Trina Clayton appeared by Zoom video - present. Court Reporter/CD Number: In Chambers and Off the Record. (Rosales, O.)
January 11, 2022 Filing 14 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Jesus Ruiz, Jr.. (Kalinowski, Daniel)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Due to the press of business, the Scheduling Conference is continued from 1/18/2022 to January 20, 2022 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report one week prior to the conference. The parties shall appear at the Scheduling Conference with each party connecting remotely either via Zoom video conference or Zoom telephone number. The parties shall be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID number and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire required. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/11/2022. (Valdez, E)
January 11, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Daniel Kalinowski on behalf of Jesus Ruiz, Jr.. Attorney Kalinowski, Daniel added. (Kalinowski, Daniel)
January 11, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Gregory Mohrman on behalf of Jesus Ruiz, Jr.. Attorney Mohrman, Gregory added. (Mohrman, Gregory)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is reassigned from *Unassigned DJ* to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston for all further proceedings. (Gonzalez, R)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): (TIME CHANGE ONLY) The Scheduling Conference currently set for January 18, 2022, at 8:30 AM has been reset the same day, January 18, 2022, to 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The parties shall appear at the conference remotely either via Zoom video conference or Zoom telephone number. The parties will be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID number and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire required. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/7/2022. (Valdez, E)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF CLARIFICATION re district judge availability to hear matters in the Eastern District of California. (Maldonado, C)
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clayton, Trina)
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Katherine P. Vilchez on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Vilchez, Katherine)
October 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Trina M. Clayton on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clayton, Trina)
October 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clayton, Trina)
October 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno County Superior Court, case number 21CECG02736 by Ford Motor Company. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9876950) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of TMC iso Removal, #2 Exhibit A to TMC Decl iso Removal, #3 Exhibit B to TMC Decl iso Removal, #4 Exhibit C to TMC Decl iso Removal, #5 Exhibit D to TMC Decl iso Removal, #6 Exhibit E to TMC Decl iso Removal, #7 Exhibit F to TMC Decl iso Removal, #8 Exhibit G to TMC Decl iso Removal, #9 Exhibit H to TMC Decl iso Removal, #10 Exhibit I to TMC Decl iso Removal, #11 Exhibit J to TMC Decl iso Removal, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Certificate of Service)(Clayton, Trina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz, Jr. v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Ruiz, Jr.
Represented By: Amy-Lyn Morse
Represented By: Steve Mikhov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Carranza
Represented By: Amy-Lyn Morse
Represented By: Steve Mikhov
Represented By: Daniel Kalinowski
Represented By: Gregory Mohrman
Represented By: Kamau Edwards
Represented By: Phil A Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Katherine P. Vilchez
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Trina M. Clayton
Represented By: Gurpreet Sandhu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?