(HC) Johnson v. Secretary of Corrections
Petitioner: Eric Johnson
Respondent: Secretary of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2021cv01560
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Petitioner's Consent or Decline due by 1/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Maldonado, C)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Eric Johnson. (Maldonado, C)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE100049649 $5.00 fbo Eric Johnson H67820 by State of California on 12/10/2021. (Sant Agata, S)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RESPONSE to #2 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Eric Johnson. (Sant Agata, S)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why Petition should not be dismissed as untimely signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/10/2021. Show Cause Response due within 30-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Order to Show Cause served on Eric Johnson. (Lundstrom, T)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Secretary of Corrections by Eric Johnson. (Rivera, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Johnson v. Secretary of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?