(HC) Collins v. Clark
Petitioner: Alphonso Collins
Respondent: Dave Clark
Case Number: 1:2021cv01585
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Jessen, A)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Assign District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Unexhausted Petition Without Prejudice re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/29/2021. Referred to Unassigned DJ; Objections to F&R due within 30 days. (Rivera, O)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been assigned to UnassignedDJ and Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The new case number is: 1:21-cv-01585-NONE-JLT (HC). ORDER OF CLARIFICATION issued re district judge availability to hear matters in the Eastern District of California. (Attachments: #1 Clarification Order) (Rivera, O)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, #7 Findings and Recommendations served on Alphonso Collins. (Rivera, O)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Alphonso Collins. (Rivera, O)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Alphonso Collins re #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/27/2021. (Rivera, O)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 12/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Rivera, O)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Alphonso Collins. (Rivera, O)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Dave Clark by Alphonso Collins. (Rivera, O)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #4 Order Authorizing IFP Status served on Alphonso Collins. (Rivera, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Collins v. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alphonso Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dave Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?