(PC) Robbins v. Fisher, et al.
Plaintiff: Earl James Robbins, Sr.
Defendant: Raythel Fisher, Jr., A. Medellin, Howard E. Moseley and M. McVay
Case Number: 1:2021cv01642
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Clerk to Randomly Assign a United States District Judge to this Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending that this Case be Dismissed for Failure to State a Claim, without Leave to Amend signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on on 01/6/2022. Referred to Judge Thurston; Objections to F&R due within Fourteen-Days.(Flores, E)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston and Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. The new case number is: 1:21-cv-1642 JLT-GSA. (Flores, E)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Earl James Robbins Sr. (Flores, E)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Lundstrom, T)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Earl James Robbins, Sr. (Lundstrom, T)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Earl James Robbins Sr. (Lundstrom, T)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lundstrom, T)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(Rivera, O)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Earl James Robbins Sr. (Rivera, O)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Corcoran. (Rivera, O)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *11/12/2021*: Consent or Decline due within 30 days. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Rivera, O)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Raythel Fisher, Jr, M. McVay, A. Medellin, Howard E. Moseley by Earl James Robbins, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rivera, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Robbins v. Fisher, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl James Robbins, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raythel Fisher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Medellin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard E. Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. McVay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?