(PC) Wilson v. Delano State Prison, et al.
Plaintiff: Christopher John Wilson
Defendant: Delano State Prison, Officer Sharps and Officer Ward
Case Number: 1:2021cv01651
Filed: November 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: BakersfieldMJ
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL: Due to the elevation of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is temporarily referred to *Magistrate Judge Helena Barch-Kuchta* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate judge is appointed. Documents filed in this case shall include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(HBK)* (Flores, E)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Notice of Temporary Magistrate Judge Referral, served on Christopher John Wilson. (Flores, E)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/14/21. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Lundstrom, T)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Christopher John Wilson. (Lundstrom, T)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Christopher John Wilson. (Lundstrom, T)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to submit Application to proceed IFP or pay filing fee within 45 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Lundstrom, T)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order served on Christopher John Wilson. (Lundstrom, T)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS (Address Current) by Christopher John Wilson. (Rivera, O)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rivera, O)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on SATF. (Rivera, O)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *11/15/2021*; Consent or Decline due within 30 days. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Rivera, O)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS (Address Current) by Christopher John Wilson. (Rivera, O)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Christopher John Wilson. (Rivera, O)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Delano State Prison, Sharps, Ward by Christopher John Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rivera, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Wilson v. Delano State Prison, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher John Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delano State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Sharps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?