Chandler et al v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitiation et al
Plaintiff: Janine Chandler, Krystal Gonzalez, Tomiekia Johnson, Nadia Romero and Woman II Woman
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitiation, Kathleen Allison, Michael Pallares and Mona D. Houston
Case Number: 1:2021cv01657
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Helena M Barch-Kuchta
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Second Joint Request for Extension of Time for Defendant to File a Responsive Pleading, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 1/13/2022. Defendants' responsive pleading to the complaint shall be filed no later than 3/11/2022. (Rivera, O)
January 12, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Second Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Kathleen Allison, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitiation, Mona D. Houston, Michael Pallares. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Corso, Anthony)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is reassigned from *Unassigned DJ* to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston for all further proceedings. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #7 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 180(b)(2), Attorney Lauren Adams' application is GRANTED and she may appear on behalf of Plaintiff Janine Taylor. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 1/10/2022. (alr)
January 7, 2022 Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Janine Chandler for attorney Lauren Adams to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10010842) (DUPLICATE RECEIPT ACAEDC-10010696 FOR $225.00 REFUNDED) (Jackson, Candice) Modified on 1/13/2022 (Washington, S).
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #4 the parties' stipulated MOTION for EXTENSION of TIME to FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING. Defendants' responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint is due no later than 2/9/2022. signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 12/21/2021. (Barch-Kuchta, Helena)
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint by Janine Chandler. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service to Summons and Complaint, #2 Proof of Service to Summons and Complaint, #3 Proof of Service to Summons and Complaint, #4 Proof of Service to Summons and Complaint)(Jackson, Candice)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Kathleen Allison, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitiation, Mona D. Houston, Michael Pallares. Attorney Corso, Anthony added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Corso, Anthony)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/18/2022 at 10:30 AM in Yosemite (HBK) before Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Clarification Order, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Kathleen Allison, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitiation, Mona D. Houston, Michael Pallares* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Candice Erin Jackson* *Freeman, Mathis & Gary LLP* *1010 B Street, Suite 300* *San Rafael, CA 94901*. (Jessen, A)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Kathleen Allison, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitiation, Mona D. Houston, Michael Pallares by Krystal Gonzalez, Tomiekia Johnson, Woman II Woman, Nadia Romero, Janine Chandler. Attorney Jackson, Candice Erin added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9931428) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Jackson, Candice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chandler et al v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitiation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janine Chandler
Represented By: Candice Erin Jackson
Represented By: Lauren Adams, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Gonzalez
Represented By: Candice Erin Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomiekia Johnson
Represented By: Candice Erin Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadia Romero
Represented By: Candice Erin Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woman II Woman
Represented By: Candice Erin Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitiation
Represented By: Anthony Corso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Allison
Represented By: Anthony Corso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Pallares
Represented By: Anthony Corso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mona D. Houston
Represented By: Anthony Corso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?