Williams v. Vista, et al.
Plaintiff: Prince Paul Raymond Williams
Defendant: J Vista, Janet Ziadeh, Ka Moua, Kari Gilbert, Kerly Keokominh, Lisa Sprague, Tiffany Brubeck and J. Vista
Case Number: 1:2021cv01661
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is reassigned from *Unassigned DJ* to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston for all further proceedings. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 10, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order Reassigning District Judge Thurston, served on Prince Paul Raymond Williams. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/14/2021. (Lundstrom, T)
December 15, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Prince Paul Raymond Williams. (Lundstrom, T)
December 10, 2021 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION in support of #4 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Prince Paul Raymond Williams. (Lundstrom, T)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/29/2021. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within fourteen (14) days of the service of this order, Plaintiff shall file a supplemental declaration explaining whether he receives or plans to receive unemployment payments, and the amount of such unemployment payments; and 2. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this order, this action shall be dismissed. (Gonzales, V)
November 29, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order served on Prince Paul Raymond Williams. (Gonzales, V)
November 24, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Prince Paul Raymond Williams. (Lundstrom, T)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Without Prejudice and REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Long Form Application, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/18/2021. $402.00 filing fee or long form application to proceed in forma pauperis due within twenty-one (21) days. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application Long Form) (Rivera, O)
November 18, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Prince Paul Raymond Williams. (Rivera, O)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Prince Paul Raymond Williams. (Rivera, O)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tiffany Brubeck, Kari Gilbert, Kerly Keokominh, Ka Moua, Lisa Sprague, J Vista, Janet Ziadeh by Prince Paul Raymond Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rivera, O)
November 17, 2021 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Rivera, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Vista, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prince Paul Raymond Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Vista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Ziadeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ka Moua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kari Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerly Keokominh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Brubeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Vista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?