Gilbert v. Nagi et al
Plaintiff: Darren Gilbert
Defendant: Sam F. Nagi Doing business as Westside Market and Fadel Nagi
Case Number: 1:2021cv01670
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Fadel Nagi served on 12/20/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (Moore, Tanya)
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sam F. Nagi served on 12/9/2021, answer due 12/30/2021. (Moore, Tanya)
December 28, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Morin, Richard)
December 28, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Fadel Nagi, Sam F. Nagi.(Morin, Richard)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Richard John Morin on behalf of Fadel Nagi, Sam F. Nagi. Attorney Morin, Richard John added. (Morin, Richard)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Fadel Nagi, Sam F. Nagi* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tanya E. Moore* *300 S. First Street* *Suite 342* *San Jose, CA 95113*. (Sant Agata, S)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Asserting Denial of Right of Access Under the Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA) against All Defendants by Darren Gilbert. Attorney Moore, Tanya E. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9935816) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Tanya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilbert v. Nagi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Gilbert
Represented By: Tanya E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam F. Nagi Doing business as Westside Market
Represented By: Richard John Morin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fadel Nagi
Represented By: Richard John Morin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?