Orozco et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Isidro Orozco and Johanna Orozco
Defendant: FCA US LLC and FCA US, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01674
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Ana de Alba
Referring Judge: Stanley A Boone
2 Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RE: STIPULATED MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/09/2023. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' stipulated motion to modify the schedule (ECF No. #29 ) is GRANTED and the scheduling order is modified as follows: Non-Expert Discovery Deadline: July 17, 2023. Expert Disclosure Deadline: July 24, 2023. Supplemental/Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline: August 7, 20234. Expert Discovery Deadline: August 21, 2023. Dispositive Motions Deadline: October 2, 2023. Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1 (ADA) before District Judge Ana de Alba. Jury Trial set for 5/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1 (ADA) before District Judge Ana de Alba. (Gonzales, V)
May 8, 2023 Filing 29 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continue Deadlines by Isidro Orozco, Johanna Orozco. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ariel Harman-Holmes in Support of Second Joint Stipulation to Continue Deadlines, #2 Proposed Order Granting Second Joint Stipulation to Continue Deadlines)(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/25/2023. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the parties' stipulated motion to modify the schedule is GRANTED, and the scheduling order is modified as follows: Non-Expert Discovery Deadline: May 22, 2023. Expert Disclosure Deadline: May 29, 2023. Supplemental Expert Disclosure Deadline: June 12, 2023. Expert Discovery Deadline: June 26, 2023. Dispositive Motion Deadline: August 7, 2023. Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1 (ADA) before District Judge Ana de Alba. Jury Trial set for 3/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1 (ADA) before District Judge Ana de Alba. All other aspects of the scheduling order continue to remain in effect. (Gonzales, V)
January 24, 2023 Filing 27 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuing Discovery Deadlines by Isidro Orozco, Johanna Orozco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Ariel Harman-Holmes)(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of *District Judge Ana de Alba* to the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned from *District Judge Dale A. Drozd* to District Judge Ana de Alba for all further proceedings. (Benson, A.)
June 7, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by James P. Mayo on behalf of FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mayo, James)
June 6, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/6/2022. Spencer Peter Hugret for FCA US, LLC in place of attorney James P. Mayo and Jon D. Universal. (Jessen, A)
June 3, 2022 Filing 22 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by FCA US, LLC. (Mayo, James)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ENTERING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/19/2022. (Rivera, O)
May 18, 2022 Filing 20 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order by FCA US, LLC. (Mayo, James)
May 10, 2022 Filing 19 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Tionna Dolin for Isidro Orozco,Tionna Dolin for Johanna Orozco, attorney Karin Kuemerle terminated (Dolin, Tionna)
April 26, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ariel Harman-Holmes on behalf of Isidro Orozco, Johanna Orozco. Attorney Harman-Holmes, Ariel added. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/29/2022. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures: April 15, 2022. Non-Expert Discovery: January 31, 2023 Expert Disclosure: February 6, 2023. Supplemental Expert Disclosure: February 27, 2023. Expert Discovery: March 17, 2023. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filing: May 18, 2023, Hearing: Pursuant to Local Rules. Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial set for 1/9/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.(Gonzales, V)
March 22, 2022 Filing 16 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Isidro Orozco, Johanna Orozco. (Kuemerle, Karin)
March 21, 2022 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Mayo, James)
March 3, 2022 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10104220. (Mayo, James)
February 24, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by James P. Mayo on behalf of FCA US, LLC. Attorney Mayo, James P. added. (Mayo, James)
February 24, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by FCA US, LLC. (Universal, Jon)
February 24, 2022 Filing 12 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by FCA US, LLC. (Universal, Jon)
February 24, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jon D. Universal on behalf of FCA US, LLC. (Universal, Jon)
February 24, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER with Jury Demand by FCA US, LLC. Attorney Universal, Jon D. added.(Universal, Jon)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO PLAINTIFFS' STATUS REPORT signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/07/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the scheduling conference currently scheduled for February 15, 2022, is CONTINUED until March 29, 2022, at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The parties shall file a joint scheduling report at least seven (7) days prior to the scheduling conference. (Gonzales, V)
February 4, 2022 Filing 8 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Isidro Orozco, Johanna Orozco. (Kuemerle, Karin)
February 4, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE Re: Status Report on Service of Complaint by All Plaintiffs re #4 Order,. (Kuemerle, Karin)
February 3, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Isidro Orozco, Johanna Orozco. Attorney Kuemerle, Karin added. (Kuemerle, Karin)
February 3, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Isidro Orozco served on 2/3/2022, answer due 2/24/2022; Johanna Orozco served on 2/3/2022, answer due 2/24/2022. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE STATUS REPORT ON SERVICE OF COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/31/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within five (5) days from the date of entry of this order, Plaintiffs shall file a notice informing the Court of the status of service on Defendant, and addressing readiness for the mandatory scheduling conference. (Gonzales, V)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *FCA US LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tionna Dolin* *1840 Century Park East* *Suite 430* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Sant Agata, S)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of Statutory Obligations against Does 1 through 10, inclusive, FCA US LLC by Isidro Orozco, Johanna Orozco. Attorney Dolin, Tionna added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9937352) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orozco et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isidro Orozco
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johanna Orozco
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: James P. Mayo
Represented By: Jon D. Universal
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?