Gilbert v. Modesto Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Darren Gilbert
Defendant: Modesto Group Inc. Doing business as McHenry Circle K, Shyam Choudhary and Neeta Choudhary
Case Number: 1:2021cv01683
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2022 Filing 8 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Neeta Choudhary, Shyam Choudhary, Modesto Group Inc.* (Flores, E)
January 4, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to All Defendants by Darren Gilbert. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tanya E. Moore, #2 Certificate of Service)(Moore, Tanya)
December 21, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Neeta Choudhary served on 12/9/2021, answer due 12/30/2021. (Moore, Tanya)
December 16, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Modesto Group Inc. served on 12/7/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. (Moore, Tanya)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Shyam Choudhary served on 12/7/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. (Moore, Tanya)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Flores, E)
November 22, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Neeta Choudhary, Shyam Choudhary, Modesto Group Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tanya E. Moore* *Moore Law Firm, P.C.* *300 South First St., Suite 342* *San Jose, CA 95113*. (Flores, E)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Asserting Denial of Right of Access Under the Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA) against All Defendants by Darren Gilbert. Attorney Moore, Tanya E. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9938537) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Tanya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilbert v. Modesto Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Gilbert
Represented By: Tanya E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modesto Group Inc. Doing business as McHenry Circle K
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shyam Choudhary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neeta Choudhary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?