Obaid et al v. Blinken et al
Plaintiff: Mohammed Saleh Obaid, Hisham Mohamed Obaid and Isam Mohamed Obaid
Defendant: Antony Blinken, Ian Brownlee, Julie Stufft, Devin Kennington, U.S. Department of State, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Jaddou, Mirash Dedvukaj, Michael Klinger, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and UR M. Jaddou
Case Number: 1:2021cv01689
Filed: November 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is reassigned from *Unassigned DJ* to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston for all further proceedings. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 3, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Isam Mohamed Obaid, Hisham Mohamed Obaid, Mohammed Saleh Obaid. U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 12/6/2021, answer due 2/4/2022; U.S. Department of State served on 12/6/2021, answer due 2/4/2022. (Goldberg, Julie)
January 3, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Isam Mohamed Obaid, Hisham Mohamed Obaid, Mohammed Saleh Obaid. Devin Kennington served on 12/6/2021, answer due 2/4/2022; Michael Klinger served on 12/6/2021, answer due 2/4/2022; Alejandro Mayorkas served on 12/6/2021, answer due 2/4/2022; Julie Stufft served on 12/6/2021, answer due 2/4/2022. (Goldberg, Julie)
January 3, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Isam Mohamed Obaid, Hisham Mohamed Obaid, Mohammed Saleh Obaid. Antony Blinken served on 12/6/2021, answer due 2/4/2022; Ian Brownlee served on 12/6/2021, answer due 2/4/2022; Mirash Dedvukaj served on 12/6/2021, answer due 2/4/2022; UR M. Jaddou served on 12/9/2021, answer due 2/7/2022. (Goldberg, Julie)
December 17, 2021 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT for Antony Blinken,Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT for Ian Brownlee,Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT for Mirash Dedvukaj,Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT for UR M. Jaddou,Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT for Devin Kennington,Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT for Michael Klinger,Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT for Alejandro Mayorkas (Hemesath, Audrey)
November 24, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/24/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Clarification Order, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
November 24, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Julie Ann Goldberg* *Goldberg & Associates* *14370 Ventura Blvd.* *Sherman Oaks, CA 91423*. (Jessen, A)
November 24, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Devin Kennington, Michael Klinger, Alejandro Mayorkas, Julie Stufft* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Julie Ann Goldberg* *Goldberg & Associates* *14370 Ventura Blvd.* *Sherman Oaks, CA 91423*. (Jessen, A)
November 24, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Antony Blinken, Ian Brownlee, Mirash Dedvukaj, Ur Jaddou* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Julie Ann Goldberg* *Goldberg & Associates* *14370 Ventura Blvd.* *Sherman Oaks, CA 91423*. (Jessen, A)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief against Antony Blinken, Ian Brownlee, Mirash Dedvukaj, Ur Jaddou, Devin Kennington, Michael Klinger, Alejandro Mayorkas, Julie Stufft, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State by Isam Mohamed Obaid, Hisham Mohamed Obaid, Mohammed Saleh Obaid. Attorney Goldberg, Julie Ann added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BCAEDC-9945547) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits A - FF)(Goldberg, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Obaid et al v. Blinken et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Saleh Obaid
Represented By: Julie Ann Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hisham Mohamed Obaid
Represented By: Julie Ann Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isam Mohamed Obaid
Represented By: Julie Ann Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antony Blinken
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Brownlee
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Stufft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Kennington
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mirash Dedvukaj
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Klinger
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UR M. Jaddou
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?