James Gavert,et al v. CF Modesto, LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Gavert, Geraldine Gavert, Rhonda Gavert and Rachelle Gavert Graham
Defendant: CF Modesto, LLC Doing business as Modesto Post Acute Center, Michael Lee Brodie, M.D. and Andreh Saralou, M.D.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01719
Filed: December 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 247
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only Entry) The Court has deemed the MOTION TO DISMISS, Doc. No. #4 , MOTION TO COMPEL, Doc. No. #6 , and MOTION TO REMAND, Doc. No. #8 , noticed for hearing on 1/31/2022 before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, suitable for decision WITHOUT oral argument pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). As such, the hearing on same is VACATED and the motion will be taken under submission as of that date. Minute order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/26/2022. (Gonzales, V)
January 24, 2022 Filing 19 REPLY by Geraldine Gavert, James Gavert, Rhonda Gavert, Rachelle Gavert Graham to RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Remand,. (Attachments: #1 Notice Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Reply)(Prada, Marisella)
January 24, 2022 Filing 18 DECLARATION of M. Prada in support of #8 Motion to Remand,. (Prada, Marisella)
January 24, 2022 Filing 17 REPLY by Geraldine Gavert, James Gavert, Rhonda Gavert, Rachelle Gavert Graham to RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Remand,. (Prada, Marisella)
January 24, 2022 Filing 16 REPLY by CF Modesto, LLC to RESPONSE to #4 Motion to Dismiss. (Kanno, Rita)
January 24, 2022 Filing 15 REPLY by CF Modesto, LLC to RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Compel,. (Kanno, Rita)
January 14, 2022 Filing 14 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by CF Modesto, LLC in re #12 Opposition to Motion. (Kanno, Rita)
January 14, 2022 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Rita R. Kanno in opposition to #8 Motion to Remand,. (Kanno, Rita)
January 14, 2022 Filing 12 OPPOSITION by CF Modesto, LLC to #8 Motion to Remand,. (Kanno, Rita)
January 14, 2022 Filing 11 OPPOSITION by Geraldine Gavert, James Gavert, Rhonda Gavert, Rachelle Gavert Graham to #6 Motion to Compel,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl of Prada ISO Opposition)(Prada, Marisella)
January 14, 2022 Filing 10 OPPOSITION by Geraldine Gavert, James Gavert, Rhonda Gavert, Rachelle Gavert Graham to #4 Motion to Dismiss. (Prada, Marisella)
December 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Marisella Prada on behalf of Geraldine Gavert, James Gavert, Rhonda Gavert, Rachelle Gavert Graham. (Prada, Marisella)
December 23, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to REMAND and Certificate of Service by Geraldine Gavert, James Gavert, Rhonda Gavert, Rachelle Gavert Graham. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Remand, #2 Declaration Declaration of Marisella Prada ISO Remand, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Prada, Marisella)
December 17, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kanno, Rita)
December 10, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to COMPEL Binding Arbitration by CF Modesto, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Granting Defendant's Motion to Compel Binding Arbitration))(Kanno, Rita)
December 10, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by CF Modesto, LLC in re #4 Motion to Dismiss. (Kanno, Rita)
December 10, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to DISMISS by CF Modesto, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss))(Kanno, Rita)
December 6, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE DIRECTING Marisella Prada, NCAED to Register to Practice in the Eastern District of California: Attorney Marisella Prada, NCAED is directed to register for admission to the Eastern District of California, please visit PACER.gov for admission. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 6, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/17/2022 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
December 6, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: 3 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction, #2 Civil New Case Documents for AWI served on Marisella Prada NCAED. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Stanislaus Superior Court, case number 21CV005754 by Geraldine Gavert, Rhonda Gavert, Rachelle Gavert Graham, James Gavert, by and through his successor in interest, Geraldine Gavert. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9957133) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Re Defendant's Notice of Removal), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement (Certificate of Service Re Civil Cover Sheet), #4 Notice (Notice to Adverse Party of Removal of Action to Federal Court), #5 Supplement (Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Removal of Action), #6 Exhibit 1 to 9 (Re Request for Judicial Ntc), #7 Exhibit 10 to 15 (Re Request for Judicial Ntc), #8 Exhibit 16 to 29 ( (Re Request for Judicial Ntc), #9 Exhibit 30 to 34 ( (Re Request for Judicial Ntc))(Kanno, Rita)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Gavert,et al v. CF Modesto, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gavert
Represented By: Marisella Prada, NCAED
Represented By: Marisella Prada
Represented By: Katja Margaret Grosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Gavert
Represented By: Marisella Prada, NCAED
Represented By: Marisella Prada
Represented By: Katja Margaret Grosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Gavert
Represented By: Marisella Prada, NCAED
Represented By: Marisella Prada
Represented By: Katja Margaret Grosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachelle Gavert Graham
Represented By: Marisella Prada, NCAED
Represented By: Marisella Prada
Represented By: Katja Margaret Grosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CF Modesto, LLC Doing business as Modesto Post Acute Center
Represented By: Rita Rebecca Kanno
Represented By: Kathleen M. Walker
Represented By: Lann Gottesman McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lee Brodie, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreh Saralou, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?