(PC) Sanchez v. Muro et al
Plaintiff: Anthony A. Sanchez
Defendant: Marina Muro, Perez, J. Nunez-Ruiz and B. Keyfaurer
Case Number: 1:2021cv01770
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to NKSP, P.O. Box 5005, Delano, CA 93216 by Anthony A. Sanchez. (Maldonado, C)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Anthony A. Sanchez. (Maldonado, C)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Out to Court: #9 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis sent to Anthony A. Sanchez at P.O. Box 3476, Corcoran, CA 93212. Notice of Change of Address due by 4/7/2022. (Maldonado, C)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Maldonado, C)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Anthony A. Sanchez. (Maldonado, C)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Anthony A. Sanchez. (Maldonado, C)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel, Without Prejudice; ORDER Directing Clerk to Send a Copy of this Order to: Anthony A. Sanchez, SO2308924, Kern County Sheriff's Department- Jail, P.O. Box 2208, Bakersfield, CA 93303-2208, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/17/2021. (Maldonado, C)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, served on Anthony A. Sanchez. (Maldonado, C)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on CSP-Corcoran for Anthony Sanchez. (Maldonado, C)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *12/16/2021*; Consent or Decline due by 1/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Maldonado, C)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Anthony A. Sanchez, CDC BA-9087 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Maldonado, C)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Anthony A. Sanchez. (Maldonado, C)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Anthony A. Sanchez. (Maldonado, C)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against B. Keyfaurer, Marina Muro, J. Nunez-Ruiz, Perez by Anthony A. Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Sanchez v. Muro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony A. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marina Muro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Nunez-Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Keyfaurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?