Olguin, Jr. v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Jose Olguin, Jr.
Defendant: FCA US LLC and FCA US, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01789
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: BakersfieldMJ
Referring Judge: Christopher D Baker
2 Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 3/10/2023. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 10/13/2023; Expert 12/15/2023. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 7/12/2023 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 1/12/2024. Dispositive Motions filed by 3/8/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial set for 8/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held off the record on 3/9/2023. Case scheduled; Court to issue Scheduling Order. Plaintiffs Counsel Ariel Harman-Holmes present. Defendants Counsel Trina Clayton present. (Hall, S)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Jose Olguin, Jr.: Amended #29 Scheduling Report. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Jose Olguin, Jr.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING Defendant's #9 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 02/13/2023. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry), signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 10/14/2022: Due to the pending motion to dismiss, along with the ongoing judicial emergency and heavy caseload experienced by this district, the Scheduling Conference currently set for 10/26/2022 before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto is CONTINUED to 3/9/2023 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. The parties shall appear at the conference remotely via Zoom video conference, and the Zoom ID and password will be provided to counsel by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The parties are reminded of their obligation to file a joint report at least one week prior to the conference and the report shall also be e-mailed, in Word format, to CDBorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Hall, S)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) The Court is aware that at least one motion remains under submission before the undersigned in this matter. As a result of the judicial resource emergency described in this Court's standing order re judicial emergency, more than 100 motions remain under submission in the caseload recently re-assigned to the undersigned. Although the Court has begun the process of working through this significant backlog, it may be six or more months until the motion(s) in this matter is resolved. The Court reiterates that the magistrate judge consent can alleviate the delay caused by the resource emergency. The parties SHALL reconsider magistrate judge consent for all purposes or only for this pending motion. In addition, the parties are reminded of their ongoing obligation to inform the Court of any changed circumstances that have rendered all or part of any pending motion moot. Finally, the parties are informed that the undersigned generally requires a formal settlement conference take place before any civil case proceeds to trial. Should any party wish to schedule a settlement conference, they are directed to contact Courtroom Deputy Irma Munoz at imunoz@caed.uscourts.gov signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on October 12, 2022. (Munoz, I)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker to the bench of the Eastern District of California, the court hereby reassigns this case from Bakersfield Magistrate Judge (BAK) to Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker for all further proceedings. (Lundstrom, T)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Vilchez, Katherine)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Trina M. Clayton on behalf of FCA US, LLC. Attorney Clayton, Trina M. added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clayton, Trina)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Katherine P. Vilchez on behalf of FCA US, LLC. Attorney Vilchez, Katherine P. added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Vilchez, Katherine)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY Spencer Peter Hugret for FCA US, LLC in place of attorney Scott Steven Shepardson, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 08/18/2022. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REQUEST for Substitution of Attorney by FCA US, LLC. (Shepardson, Scott)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/22/2022: In light of the pending motion to dismiss, the Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2022 is CONTINUED to 10/26/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties are reminded of their obligation to file a joint scheduling report at least one week prior to the conference. (Text Only Entry) (Hall, S)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Tionna Dolin for Jose Olguin, Jr., attorney Karin Kuemerle terminated (Dolin, Tionna)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ariel Harman-Holmes on behalf of Jose Olguin, Jr.. Attorney Harman-Holmes, Ariel added. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY by FCA US, LLC re #9 Motion to Dismiss,. (Attachments: #1 Defendant FCA US LLC's Objections to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order)(Shepardson, Scott)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Jose Olguin, Jr. in re #13 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Recall T23, #2 Exhibit B - December 12, 2017 Correspondence, #3 Exhibit C - January 22, 2018 Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Safety Recall U01, #5 Exhibit E - Revised U01 March 2018)(Kuemerle, Karin)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 OPPOSITION by Jose Olguin, Jr. to #9 Motion to Dismiss,. (Kuemerle, Karin)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Jose Olguin, Jr.. Attorney Kuemerle, Karin added. (Kuemerle, Karin)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) The parties are advised that pursuant to the undersigned's standing order and Local Rule 230(g), the recently filed motion to dismiss #9 will be decided on the papers. No hearing will be calendared. The hearing date selected by the movant will nonetheless serve to govern the deadlines for opposition and reply briefs pursuant to Local Rule 230(c). The parties are further informed that as a result of the judicial resource emergency described in this Court's standing order re judicial emergency, more than 100 motions remain under submission in the caseload recently re-assigned to the undersigned. Although the Court has begun the process of working through this significant backlog, it may still be many months until the motion in this matter is resolved. The Court reiterates that magistrate judge consent may alleviate some of the delays caused by the resource emergency signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on February 2, 2022. (Munoz, I)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/2/2022: In light of the pending motion to dismiss, the Scheduling Conference set for 3/16/2022 is CONTINUED to 7/12/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties are reminded of their obligation to file a joint scheduling report at least one week prior to the conference. (Text Only Entry) (Hall, S)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to DISMISS by FCA US, LLC. Attorney Shepardson, Scott Steven added. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Defendant FCA US LLC's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Defendant FCA US LLC's Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons)(Shepardson, Scott)
January 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Tionna Dolin. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/26/2022. (Gonzalez, R)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: FCA US, LLC served on 1/11/2022, answer due 2/1/2022. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is reassigned from *Unassigned DJ* to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston for all further proceedings. Documents filed in this case shall continue to include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(SKO)* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate is appointed. (Gonzalez, R)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL: Due to the elevation of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is temporarily referred to *Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate judge is appointed. Documents filed in this case shall include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(SKO)* (Gonzalez, R)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Worksheet, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #4 Clarification Order, #5 Consent Form, #6 VDRP) (Flores, E)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *FCA US LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tionna Dolin* *Strategic Legal Practices, APC* *1840 Century Park East, Suite 430* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Flores, E)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC by Jose Olguin, Jr. Attorney Dolin, Tionna added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9982083) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olguin, Jr. v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Olguin, Jr.
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Scott Steven Shepardson
Represented By: Katherine P. Vilchez
Represented By: Trina M. Clayton
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?