(PC) Palmer v. Superior Court of San Bernardino County et al
Plaintiff: Johnny Curtis Palmer
Defendant: Superior Court of San Bernardino County, Christian Pfeiffer, Eric Mazza, Hernandez, M. Melendrez, A. Leyva, C. Gonzales and M. Lozano
Case Number: 1:2021cv01807
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Rivera, O)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Johnny Curtis Palmer. (Rivera, O)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Johnny Curtis Palmer. (Rivera, O)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Johnny Curtis Palmer, CDC G-52320 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Lundstrom, T)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Johnny Curtis Palmer. (Lundstrom, T)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Plaintiff to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/28/2021. IFP Due Within Forty-Five Days. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(Maldonado, C)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Johnny Curtis Palmer. (Maldonado, C)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Kern Valley Prison for Johnny Palmer. (Maldonado, C)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *12/27/2021*;Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due by 1/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Maldonado, C)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against C. Gonzales, Hernandez, A. Leyva, M. Lozano, Eric Mazza, M. Melendrez, Christian Pfeiffer, Superior Court of San Bernardino County by Johnny Curtis Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Palmer v. Superior Court of San Bernardino County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Curtis Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Court of San Bernardino County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Mazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Melendrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Leyva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Lozano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?