(PC) Martin v. Castillo, et al.
Plaintiff: Jared Andrew Martin
Defendant: D. Castillo, Christian Pfeiffer, Darren Huckabay, Raythel Fisher, E. Guthery, A. Leyva, Kathleen Allison, J. Melvin, T. Jarrett and N. Salas
Case Number: 1:2022cv00002
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCREENING ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File an Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/25/2022. First Amended Complaint due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form). (Jessen, A)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #18 Screening Order served on Jared Andrew Martin. (Jessen, A)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TERMINATING #16 Motion to Proceed IFP; Previous #12 Motion to Proceed IFP GRANTED per #15 Order. (Sant Agata, S)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jared Andrew Martin. (Sant Agata, S)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Marrujo, C)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Jared Andrew Martin. (Marrujo, C)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Jared Andrew Martin. (Marrujo, C)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Jared Andrew Martin, CDC BL-1279 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Marrujo, C)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jared Andrew Martin. (Marrujo, C)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SECOND ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis OR Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP App & Instructions.Prisoner) (Marrujo, C)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order served on Jared Andrew Martin. (Marrujo, C)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jared Andrew Martin. (Marrujo, C)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is: 1:22-CV-00002-DAD-SAB. (Maldonado, C)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Maldonado, C)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Jared Andrew Martin. (Maldonado, C)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel, Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/10/2022. (Marrujo, C)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel served on Jared Andrew Martin. (Marrujo, C)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP App & Instructions.Prisoner)(Marrujo, C)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order served on Jared Andrew Martin. (Marrujo, C)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on KVSP. (Rivera, O)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *1/3/2022*; Consent or Decline due within 30 days. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Rivera, O)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Jared Andrew Martin. (Rivera, O)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jared Andrew Martin. (Rivera, O)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Kathleen Allison, D. Castillo, Raythel Fisher, E. Guthery, Darren Huckabay, T. Jarrett, A. Leyva, J. Melvin, Christian Pfeiffer, N. Salas by Jared Andrew Martin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rivera, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Martin v. Castillo, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Andrew Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Huckabay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raythel Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Guthery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Leyva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Melvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Jarrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?