(HC) Mickling v. Trate
Petitioner: Maurice A. Mickling
Respondent: Trate
Case Number: 1:2022cv00010
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE100049860 $5.00 fbo Maurice Mickling 40250013 by United States Treasury on 1/18/2022. (Jessen, A)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Maldonado, C)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT FOR RESPONDENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/5/2022. (RESPONDENT'S Consent or Decline due by 2/7/2022) (Martin-Gill, S)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/5/2022. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (Consent or Decline due by 3/10/2022)(Martin-Gill, S)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition, served on Maurice A. Mickling. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 2/7/2022 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Martin-Gill, S)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Maurice A. Mickling, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/4/2022. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Order Authorizing IFP Status, #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Maurice A. Mickling. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 2241 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Trate by Maurice A. Mickling.(Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Mickling v. Trate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maurice A. Mickling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Trate
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?