United States of America v. Dunn
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Pauline L. Dunn
Case Number: 1:2022cv00058
Filed: January 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America re #3 Order to Show Cause,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings, #4 Exhibit, #1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons. (Thiess, GOVT, David)
January 20, 2022 Filing 4 EXHIBIT A & B by United States of America re #1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Thiess, GOVT, David)
January 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONDENT TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THEY SHOULD NOT BE COMPELLED TO COMPLY WITH IRS SUMMONS signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/14/2022. Show Cause Hearing set for 3/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Gonzales, V)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2 PROPOSED ORDER re Show Cause re: Tax Summons Enforcement by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities)(Thiess, GOVT, David)
January 13, 2022 NEW CASE FILED - Petition to Enforce IRS Summons (text only). (Marrujo, C)
January 12, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION to ENFORCE IRS SUMMONS by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thiess, GOVT, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: David Edward Thiess, GOVT, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pauline L. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?