Stoeckel v. Clovis et al
Plaintiff: Dallas Stoeckel
Defendant: City Of Clovis, Timothy Dronek, Meredith Alexander, Johnathan Rodriguez and Jacob Mulhern
Case Number: 1:2022cv00070
Filed: January 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Filing 13 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Johnathan Rodriguez on 2/24/2022, Answer due 4/25/2022 (Little, Kevin)
March 4, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Jacob Mulhern on 2/16/2022, Answer due 4/18/2022 (Little, Kevin)
March 4, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Timothy Dronek on 2/16/2022, Answer due 4/18/2022 (Little, Kevin)
March 4, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Meredith Alexander on 2/16/2022, Answer due 4/18/2022 (Little, Kevin)
March 4, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to City Of Clovis on 2/24/2022, Answer due 4/25/2022 (Little, Kevin)
February 28, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Johnathan Rodriguez. Attorney Driskill, Wiley Russ added.(Driskill, Wiley)
February 14, 2022 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Dallas Stoeckel.(Little, Kevin)
February 14, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Johnathan Rodriguez served on 1/21/2022, answer due 2/11/2022. (Little, Kevin)
February 14, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Meredith Alexander served on 1/21/2022, answer due 2/11/2022; City Of Clovis served on 1/21/2022, answer due 2/11/2022; Timothy Dronek served on 1/21/2022, answer due 2/11/2022; Jacob Mulhern served on 1/21/2022, answer due 2/11/2022. (Little, Kevin)
January 18, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Flores, E)
January 18, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Meredith Alexander, City Of Clovis, Timothy Dronek, Jacob Mulhern, Johnathan Rodriguez* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kevin G. Little* *Law Office of Kevin G. Little* *P.O. Box 8656* *Freso, CA 93747*. (Flores, E)
January 15, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Dallas Stoeckel (Little, Kevin)
January 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Dallas Stoeckel. Attorney Little, Kevin G added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10025866) (Little, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoeckel v. Clovis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Stoeckel
Represented By: Kevin G Little
Represented By: Michelle Letricia Tostenrude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Clovis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Dronek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meredith Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnathan Rodriguez
Represented By: Mark K. Kitabayashi
Represented By: Wiley Russ Driskill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Mulhern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?