Esla v. PODS Enterprises, LLC
Plaintiff: Alan Esla
Defendant: PODS Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00080
Filed: January 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: BakersfieldMJ
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2022 Filing 9 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Alan Esla. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling Conference Worksheet)(Kharazi, Hadi)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/27/2022. Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 4/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Hall, S)
January 26, 2022 Filing 7 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continue Scheduling Conference by Alan Esla. (Kharazi, Hadi)
January 20, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by PODS Enterprises, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Krause-Leemon, David)
January 20, 2022 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/16/2022 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 BAK Worksheet, #2 Standing Order, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Rivera, O)
January 20, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL: Due to the elevation of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is temporarily referred to *Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate judge is appointed. Documents filed in this case shall include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(SAB)* (Rivera, O)
January 19, 2022 RECEIPT number ACAEDC-10031236 for $402.00 for PODS Enterprises, LLC from Krause-Leemon, David R. (Rivera, O)
January 19, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by PODS Enterprises, LLC. (Krause-Leemon, David)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by PODS Enterprises, LLC (Krause-Leemon, David)
January 19, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court, case number BCV-21-102901 by Alan Esla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - State Court Answer)(Krause-Leemon, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esla v. PODS Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Esla
Represented By: Hadi Ty Kharazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PODS Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: David R. Krause-Leemon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?