(PC) Outhoummountry v. Pascua et al
Plaintiff: Stacen Omar Outhoummountry
Defendant: N. Pascua and M. Childress
Case Number: 1:2022cv00104
Filed: January 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Stacen Omar Outhoummountry. (Lundstrom, T)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against M. Childress, N. Pascua by Stacen Omar Outhoummountry.(Lundstrom, T)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCREENING ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Leave to File an Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/3/2022. Amended complaint due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form) (Rivera, O)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Screening Order served on Stacen Omar Outhoummountry. (Rivera, O)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Marrujo, C)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Flores, E)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel, Without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/25/2022. (Jessen, A)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel served on Stacen Omar Outhoummountry. (Jessen, A)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Stacen Omar Outhoummountry. (Flores, E)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 2/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Flores, E)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:21-cv-09927.
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Stacen Omar Outhoummountry. (Flores, E)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Case transferred to Eastern District of California per #9 Order. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2022) [Transferred from cand on 1/25/2022.]
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/19/2022. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 1/25/2022.]
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by Stacen Omar Outhoummountry. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2022) [Transferred from cand on 1/25/2022.]
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk has received plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, Stacen Omar Outhoummountry BI-0775, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 1/25/2022.]
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Stacen Omar Outhoummountry.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2022) [Transferred from cand on 1/25/2022.]
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Stacen Omar Outhoummountry. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2022) [Transferred from cand on 1/25/2022.]
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 1/25/2022.]
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE: re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 1/31/2022. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 1/25/2022.]
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Stacen Omar Outhoummountry. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021) [Transferred from cand on 1/25/2022.]
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Under the Prisoner Civil Rights Act against M. Childress, N. Pascua (Filing fee IFPP.). Filed by Stacen Omar Outhoummountry. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021) [Transferred from cand on 1/25/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Outhoummountry v. Pascua et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacen Omar Outhoummountry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Pascua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?