(PC) Porter v. Rivas et al
Plaintiff: Larry James Porter
Defendant: O. Rivas and T. Cisneros
Case Number: 1:2022cv00105
Filed: January 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: BakersfieldMJ
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP as MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/9/2022. (Sant Agata, S)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Larry James Porter. (Sant Agata, S)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE to the Court re Filing Fee by Larry James Porter. (Flores, E)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE100050132 $402.00 fbo Larry James Porter by Larry James Porter on 3/4/2022. (Lundstrom, T)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE to #11 Order Following Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show cause by Larry James Porter. (Flores, E)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Following Plaintiff's #10 Response to Order to Show Cause why Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Should not be Denied; ORDER Extending Deadline for Plaintiff to Submit Filing Fee signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 02/17/2022. Twenty-One Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order served on Larry James Porter. (Flores, E)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE to #8 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Larry James Porter. (Flores, E)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Sant Agata, S)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis should not be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/27/2022. Show Cause Response due within Twenty-One (21) Days.(Sant Agata, S)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order to Show Cause served on Larry James Porter. (Sant Agata, S)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Larry James Porter. (Sant Agata, S)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL: Due to the elevation of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is temporarily referred to *Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate judge is appointed. Documents filed in this case shall include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(SKO)* (Sant Agata, S)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Larry James Porter, CDC C-46380 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Sant Agata, S)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: New Case Documents served on Corcoran State Prison. (Sant Agata, S)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *1/25/2022*; Consent or Decline due by 2/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Sant Agata, S)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Larry Porter. (Sant Agata, S)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against T. Cisneros, O. Rivas by Larry Porter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sant Agata, S)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Notice of Temporary Magistrate Judge Referral, served on Larry James Porter. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Porter v. Rivas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry James Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Cisneros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?