Mushegh Sargsyan et al v. FCA US, LLC
Plaintiff: Mushegh Sargsyan and Mariam Nerkararyan
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00129
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Helena M Barch-Kuchta
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 3/30/2023: Deadline for providing mandatory initial disclosures by 4/12/2023; Deadline to move to join a party or amend pleadings by 5/15/2023: Mid-Discovery Status Conference Hearing set for 9/14/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta, Report due by 8/31/2023. Deadline to complete non-expert discovery by 10/20/2023; Deadline for plaintiff and defendant to disclose expert report(s)by 11/03/2023; Deadline for disclosing any expert rebuttal report(s)by 12/01/2023; Deadline for Expert discovery by 1/19/2024.Deadline to advise the Court of settlement, ADR, VDRP or mediation efforts to date by 10/20/2023. Dispositive motions filed by 3/15/2024. Deadline to file final joint pretrial statement, motion(s) in limine, proposed jury instructions, and verdict form by 8/16/2024. Final Pretrial conference set for 8/23/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial set for 10/7/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston (3-5 day time estimate).(Navarro, F))
March 30, 2023 Filing 32 MINUTES (Text Only for proceedings held telephonically before Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta: INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 3/30/2023. Plaintiff's Counsel Ariel Harman-Holmes telephonically present and Defendants' Counsel Greg Gruzman telephonically present. A written case management and scheduling order to be issued. (Navarro, F)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry): The Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/30/2023 will be conducted telephonically. Parties are directed to call using (Dial in 888-204-5984; access code 4446176) Signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 3/29/2023. (Apodaca, P)
March 16, 2023 Filing 30 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT filed by Mariam Nerkararyan, Mushegh Sargsyan. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
January 25, 2023 Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only): On January 17, 2023, the Court entered an ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE due to Defendant's failure to file a timely response or answer under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 and Plaintiff's failure to move for a clerk's default under Fed. R. Civ. 55. (Doc. No. #22 ). On January 19, 2022, Defendant filed an Answer (Doc. No. #25 ) and counsel entered appearances on behalf of Defendant. (Doc. Nos. #23 , #26 , #27 , and #28 ). In light of Defendant's Answer, the Court discharges the Order to Show Cause (Doc. No #22 ) and sets this case for a mandatory telephonic Scheduling Conference for March 30, 2023 at 10:30 AM. The Parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report no later than March 16, 2023. (Apodaca, P)
January 19, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Greg Gruzman on behalf of FCA US, LLC. Attorney Gruzman, Greg added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gruzman, Greg)
January 19, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Hailey Rogerson on behalf of FCA US, LLC. Attorney Rogerson, Hailey added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey)
January 19, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of FCA US, LLC. Attorney Hugret, Spencer Peter added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
January 19, 2023 Filing 25 ANSWER by FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Azemoon, Ali)
January 19, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Azemoon, Ali)
January 19, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ali Azemoon on behalf of FCA US, LLC. Attorney Azemoon, Ali added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Azemoon, Ali)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 1/17/2023. (Fourteen Day Deadline) (Apodaca, P)
September 15, 2022 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Mushegh Sargsyan served on 9/15/2022, answer due 10/6/2022. (Dolin, Tionna)
September 15, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *FCA US, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tionna Dolin* *1888 Century Park East* *19th Floor* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Sant Agata, S)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER: This matter was filed in the Central District of California on January 10, 2022. (Doc. No. #1 ). On February 1, 2022, the Central District transferred this action to this Court. (Doc. No. #13 ). Civil New Case Documents issued and a mandatory Initial Scheduling Conference was scheduled for September 15, 2022 before the undersigned. (Doc. No. #14 ). Upon sua sponte review of the docket, the Court notes that service has not been effectuated upon Defendant. Because Defendant has not been served the Court cannot conduct the Scheduling Conference. The Court VACATES Initial Scheduling Conference set for September 15, 2022 at 11:30 AM before the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 9/14/2022: (Text Only Entry)(Barch-Kuchta, Helena)
September 12, 2022 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE re #15 Summons Returned Unexecuted: Please disregard. Attached document does not match entry. (Rivera, O)
May 10, 2022 Filing 17 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Tionna Dolin,Ariel Harman-Holmes for Mariam Nerkararyan,Tionna Dolin,Ariel Harman-Holmes for Mushegh Sargsyan, attorney Karin Kuemerle terminated (Dolin, Tionna)
February 22, 2022 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kuemerle, Karin)
February 22, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Mariam Nerkararyan, Mushegh Sargsyan. (Dolin, Tionna)
February 2, 2022 Filing 14 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/15/2022 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (HBK) before Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
February 1, 2022 Filing 13 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 2:22-cv-00205.
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court concludes that transferring this case will better serve the interests of justice and the convenience of the parties and witnesses. Transfer under 1404(a) is therefore appropriate. The Court hereby orders the Clerk to transfer this action to the Fresno Divisional Office of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California for the convenience of the parties and witnesses. See 28 U.S.C. 1404. Case transferred electronically on 1/28/2022. (See minute order for details). (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) [Transferred from cacd on 2/1/2022.]
January 26, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Mariam Nerkararyan, Mushegh Sargsyanto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #9 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karin Kuemerle in Response to Order to Show Case Re: Venue, #2 Declaration of Mushegh Sargsyan in Response to Order to Show Cause Re: Venue)(Kuemerle, Karin) [Transferred from cacd on 2/1/2022.]
January 26, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Plaintiffs Mariam Nerkararyan, Mushegh Sargsyan (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Mariam Nerkararyan(pty:pla), Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Mushegh Sargsyan(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin) [Transferred from cacd on 2/1/2022.]
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson. To assist the Court in determining whether transfer is appropriate and in the interest of justice, the parties are directed to address the following, in addition to sharing their positions as to which forum is more convenient for the parties and witnesses: (see minute order for details). Plaintiffs are ordered to personally serve a copy of this order on Defendant if Defendant has already been served with the Complaint within three (3) court days of the date of this Order or at the time of service if Defendant has not been already been served. Plaintiffs' Response to this Order to Show Cause shall be filed no later than January 26, 2022. (mrgo) [Transferred from cacd on 2/1/2022.]
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See attached document for details) (mrgo) [Transferred from cacd on 2/1/2022.]
January 12, 2022 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs' Mariam Nerkararyan, Mushegh Sargsyan. (Dolin, Tionna) [Transferred from cacd on 2/1/2022.]
January 12, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 2/1/2022.]
January 12, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 2/1/2022.]
January 12, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 2/1/2022.]
January 10, 2022 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiffs' Mariam Nerkararyan, Mushegh Sargsyan, identifying Mushegh Sargsyan and Mariam Nerkararyan. (Dolin, Tionna) [Transferred from cacd on 2/1/2022.]
January 10, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Mariam Nerkararyan, Mushegh Sargsyan. (Dolin, Tionna) [Transferred from cacd on 2/1/2022.]
January 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32598486 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs' Mushegh Sargsyan, Mariam Nerkararyan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2018 Pacifica Warranty) (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Mariam Nerkararyan(pty:pla), Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Mushegh Sargsyan(pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna) [Transferred from cacd on 2/1/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mushegh Sargsyan et al v. FCA US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mushegh Sargsyan
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariam Nerkararyan
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Ali Azemoon
Represented By: Hailey Rogerson
Represented By: Greg Gruzman
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?