Wright et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Mary F. Wright and Ronnie Empson
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2022cv00137
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Mary F. Wright. All Defendants. (Karlin, Marc)
February 2, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/3/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
February 2, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States of America* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Marc A. Karlin* *Karlin & Karlin, APLC* *535 N. Brand Blvd., Suite 701* *Glendale, CA 91203*. (Marrujo, C)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Mary F. Wright (Karlin, Marc)
February 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Mary F. Wright. Attorney Karlin, Marc A. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10055100) (Karlin, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary F. Wright
Represented By: Marc A. Karlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Empson
Represented By: Marc A. Karlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?