(HC) Joven v. Cates
Petitioner: Eloy Joven, Jr.
Respondent: Brian Cates
Case Number: 1:2022cv00168
Filed: February 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2022 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY): This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The new case number is: 1:22-cv-00168-DAD-SKO (HC). (Jessen, A)
March 16, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Whitney, Charity)
February 27, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Stubb, Paul)
February 11, 2022 Filing 5 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #3 Order Requiring Respondent to File a Response to the Petition and #4 Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment served on Attorney General - Tami Krenzin. (Rivera, O)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/11/2022. Consent or Decline due within 30 days. (Rivera, O)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING Respondent to File a Response; ORDER SETTING Briefing Schedule; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Serve Documents on Attorney General, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/10/2022. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (Rivera, O)
February 9, 2022 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 3/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Marrujo, C)
February 8, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against All Defendants by Eloy Joven, Jr. (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number ACAEDC-10067607) (Stubb, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Joven v. Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eloy Joven, Jr.
Represented By: Paul Stubb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Cates
Represented By: Charity Seraph Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?