Brown v. City of Fresno, et al.
Plaintiff: Lewis Dewane Brown
Defendant: City of Fresno, Chief Paco Balderrama, Former Chief Andrew Hall, Mayor Jerry Dyer, Lt. Robert Beckwith, Sgt. Troy Miller, Officer Gary Holden, Officer Andrew Diaz, Officer Nicholas Quisenberry and Unknown Law Enforcement Officers
Case Number: 1:2022cv00216
Filed: February 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE SERVICE AND CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/17/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to complete service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) is GRANTED. The deadline for Plaintiff to complete service on Defendants shall be extended until 120 days after entry of this order. The scheduling conference currently set for May 23, 2022, is CONTINUED to December 6, 2022, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9. The parties shall file a joint scheduling report seven (7) days prior to the scheduling conference. (Gonzales, V)
May 16, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Status of Service by Lewis Dewane Brown. (Little, Kevin)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Notice of Status of Service, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/10/2022. Plaintiff shall file notice of status of service within five days of the date of entry of this order. (Rivera, O)
February 22, 2022 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/23/2022 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Rivera, O)
February 22, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Andrew Diaz, Gary Holden, Troy Miller, Nicholas Quisenberry, Unknown Law Enforcement Officers* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kevin G Little* *Law Office of Kevin G. Little* *Post Office Box 8656* *Fresno, CA 93747*. (Rivera, O)
February 22, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Paco Balderrama, Robert Beckwith, Jerry Dyer, City of Fresno, Andrew Hall* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kevin G Little* *Law Office of Kevin G. Little* *Post Office Box 8656* *Fresno, CA 93747*. (Rivera, O)
February 21, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Lewis Dewane Brown (Little, Kevin)
February 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages, Declaratory, and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants by Lewis Dewane Brown. Attorney Little, Kevin G added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10086107) (Little, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. City of Fresno, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Dewane Brown
Represented By: Michelle Letricia Tostenrude
Represented By: Kevin G Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fresno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Paco Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Former Chief Andrew Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Jerry Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Robert Beckwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Troy Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Gary Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Andrew Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Nicholas Quisenberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Law Enforcement Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?