Buttner v. Ninos
Plaintiff: Christopher Buttner
Defendant: Michael Ninos
Case Number: 1:2022cv00244
Filed: February 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
2 Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO CLOSE CASE AND ADJUST THE DOCKET TO REFLECT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO RULE 41(a) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE #10 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/25/2022. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
April 22, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Christopher Buttner. (Pranatadjaja, Samantha)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/28/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Defendant shall file a pleading responsive to the complaint on or before April 25, 2022. (Gonzales, V)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/28/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Defendant shall file a pleading responsive to the complaint on or before April 25, 2022 The mandatory initial scheduling conference is SET for June 7, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 9 before the Honorable Stanley A. Boone. The parties shall file a joint scheduling report seven (7) days prior to the scheduling conference. (Gonzales, V)
March 25, 2022 Filing 7 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond re #1 Complaint by Michael Ninos. (West, Stuart)
March 25, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Stuart James West on behalf of Michael Ninos. Attorney West, Stuart James added. (West, Stuart)
March 15, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Michael Ninos served on 3/6/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (Pranatadjaja, Samantha)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Recusal and VACATING Scheduling Conference Date, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/1/2022. New Case Number: 1:22-cv-00244-JLT-SAB. (Marrujo, C)
February 28, 2022 Filing 3 TRADEMARK NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Trademark #1:* 90047260 * * 6/22/2022 * * See Complaint * ; copy of Complaint and Trademark Report emailed to U.S. Office of Patents and Trademarks. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 Trademark Report, #4 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
February 28, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Michael Ninos* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Samantha I. Pranatadjaja* *Carroll & Associates, P.C.* *3600 American River Drive, Suite 205* *Sacramento, CA 95864*. (Marrujo, C)
February 25, 2022 RECEIPT number ACAEDC-10095386 for $402.00 paid on 2/25/2022 by Samantha I. Pranatadjaja fbo Plaintiffs. (Marrujo, C)
February 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Ninos by Christopher Buttner. Attorney Pranatadjaja, Samantha I. added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pranatadjaja, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buttner v. Ninos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Buttner
Represented By: Sheila Lamb Carroll
Represented By: Samantha I. Pranatadjaja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ninos
Represented By: Stuart James West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?