Bonchon International, Inc., et al. v. Nabiekim Enterprises, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Bonchon International, Inc., Bonchon U.S.A., Inc. and Bonchon Franchise LLC
Defendant: Nabiekim Enterprises, Inc., Kaye Y. Kim and Calvin Kim
Case Number: 1:2022cv00311
Filed: March 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Helena M Barch-Kuchta
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING Parties' #11 Motion for Leave for Plaintiff to File a First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 05/10/2022. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 3, 2022 Filing 11 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Bonchon Franchise LLC, Bonchon International, Inc., Bonchon U.S.A., Inc.. (Conrad, Mark)
April 14, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Calvin Kim, Kaye Y. Kim, Nabiekim Enterprises, Inc.. Attorney Luther, Douglas R. added. (Luther, Douglas)
April 13, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Kaye Y. Kim served on 4/1/2022, answer due 4/22/2022. (Conrad, Mark)
April 13, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Calvin Kim served on 4/1/2022, answer due 4/22/2022. (Conrad, Mark)
April 13, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Nabiekim Enterprises, Inc. served on 3/29/2022, answer due 4/19/2022. (Conrad, Mark)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #2 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 180(b)(2), Attorney James D. Weinberger's application is GRANTED and he may appear on behalf of Plaintiffs Bonchon International, Inc.; Bonchon U.S.A., Inc.; and Bonchon Franchise LLC. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 4/12/2022. (Glinzak, Louis)
March 17, 2022 Filing 5 TRADEMARK NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Trademark #1:* 5,596,065 * * 10/30/2018 * * Seo, Jinduk (Korea, Republic of Individual) * Trademark #2:* 6,176,828 * * 10/13/2020 * * Bonchon U.S.A., Inc. (New York Corporation) * Trademark #3:* 6,295,809 * * 3/16/2021 * * Bonchon U.S.A., Inc. (New York Corporation) * Trademark #4:* 6,322,772 * * 4/13/2021 * * Bonchon U.S.A., Inc. (New York Corporation) * Trademark #5:* 6,343,494 * * 5/4/2021 * * Bonchon U.S.A., Inc. (New York Corporation) *; copy of Complaint and Trademark Report emailed to U.S. Office of Patents and Trademarks. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/17/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (HBK) before Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 Trademark Report, #4 VDRP) (Rivera, O)
March 17, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Calvin Kim, Kaye Y. Kim, Nabiekim Enterprises, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mark Russell Conrad* *Conrad Metlitzky Kane LLP* *Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1400* *San Francisco, CA 94111*. (Rivera, O)
March 17, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiffs Bonchon Franchise LLC, Bonchon International, Inc., Bonchon U.S.A., Inc.. (Conrad, Mark)
March 17, 2022 Filing 2 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Bonchon Franchise LLC, Bonchon International, Inc., Bonchon U.S.A., Inc. for attorney James D. Weinberger to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10129252) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Conrad, Mark)
March 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Bonchon International, Inc., Bonchon U.S.A., Inc., Bonchon Franchise LLC. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10129170) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conrad, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonchon International, Inc., et al. v. Nabiekim Enterprises, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonchon International, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Russell Conrad
Represented By: James D. Weinberger, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonchon U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Mark Russell Conrad
Represented By: James D. Weinberger, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonchon Franchise LLC
Represented By: Mark Russell Conrad
Represented By: James D. Weinberger, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nabiekim Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas R. Luther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaye Y. Kim
Represented By: Douglas R. Luther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Kim
Represented By: Douglas R. Luther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?