Oba et al v. Larsen et al
Plaintiff: Nancy M. Oba and Mark T. Oba
Defendant: Steve Larsen, Mac Samuels, Stan Lee, Sophia Williams, Earl Walter, Regina Tihfon, Technosolis Informatics LTD, Technocare Technology, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00395
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Ana de Alba
Referring Judge: Helena M Barch-Kuchta
2 Judge: Erica P Grosjean
3 Judge: Anthony W Ishii
4 Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2022 Filing 39 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Bevan, Eric)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Ana de Alba on 8/31/2022: (Text Only Entry) This matter is set for hearing before District Judge de Alba. The parties are ordered to submit a joint status report, not to exceed five pages, within 10 court days, that addresses the following: What is the procedural history of the case? Is the motion presently before the court still at issue for the parties? Have the parties engaged in settlement negotiations whether formally or informally? If so, when? Would the parties benefit from a mandatory settlement conference before a Magistrate Judge? Would the parties benefit from a status conference with Judge de Alba? The parties are further advised that due to the judicial resource emergency and COVID pandemic, there are more than 130 motions currently under submission in Judge de Alba's recently re-assigned caseload. The Court understands the impact that such a backlog has on the parties and although the Court will continue working diligently to resolve all pending motions, it may still be months before the parties' pending motion is resolved. As such, in light of having the heaviest district court caseload in the nation, limited Court resources, and the need to prioritize criminal and older civil matters over more recently filed actions, this Court strongly encourages the parties to consent to conduct all further proceedings before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (Hernandez, M)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of *District Judge Ana de Alba* to the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned from *District Judge Dale A. Drozd* to District Judge Ana de Alba for all further proceedings. (Donati, J)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on July 11, 2022: On July 8, 2022, this case was reassigned to the undersigned. (ECF No. #35 ). Upon review of the docket, the Court cancels the scheduling conference set for September 1, 2022, and the requirement to file a joint scheduling report by August 18, 2022. (ECF No. 33 ). Within ten days after the issuance of the rulings on the Motions to Dismiss, should the matter go forward, the parties are directed to contact Courtroom Deputy Michelle Rooney (mrooney@caed.uscourts.gov) to secure a new scheduling conference date. (Text Only Entry)(Rooney, M)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER RELATING and REASSIGNING CASE signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 07/07/2022. New Case Number: 1:22-cv-395 DAD-EPG.(Flores, E)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/8/2022: (Text Only Entry)The hearing on the Motions to Dismiss #12 and #13 currently set for 7/11/2022 at 1:30 pm before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii is VACATED. The Court to issue an order. (Apodaca, P)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING (Doc. #31 ) Joint Motion to continue. The scheduling conference set for July 14, 2022, is continued to September 1, 2022 at 10:00 AM. The Parties must file a joint scheduling report no later than August 18, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 7/7/2022. (Glinzak, Louis)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ORDER ONLY. Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 180(b)(2), Attorney Amy Rubin's Petition for Pro Hac Vice #30 is GRANTED and she may appear on behalf of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 7/6/2022. (Glinzak, Louis)
July 5, 2022 Filing 31 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continue Scheduling Conference by Mark T. Oba, Nancy M. Oba. (Kharazi, Hadi)
July 5, 2022 Filing 30 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for attorney Amy S. Rubin to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Bevan, Eric)
June 16, 2022 Filing 29 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Steve Larsen, Stan Lee, Mac Samuels, Regina Tihfon, Earl Walter, Sophia Williams.* (Sant Agata, S)
June 2, 2022 Filing 28 REPLY by Bank of America, N.A. re #14 Request for Judicial Notice,. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Vergara, Catalina)
June 2, 2022 Filing 27 REPLY by Bank of America, N.A. to RESPONSE to #13 Motion to Dismiss,,. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Vergara, Catalina)
June 2, 2022 Filing 26 REPLY by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to RESPONSE to #12 Motion to Dismiss. (Bevan, Eric)
May 23, 2022 Filing 25 OPPOSITION by Mark T. Oba, Nancy M. Oba to #13 Motion to Dismiss,,. (Attachments: #1 Objections to Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Objections to Evidence Submitted by Defendant Bank of America N.A.'s Counsel, #3 Proposed Order On Plaintiffs' Objections to Evidence Submitted by Defendant Bank of America N.A's Counsel)(Kharazi, Hadi)
May 23, 2022 Filing 24 OPPOSITION by Mark T. Oba, Nancy M. Oba to #12 Motion to Dismiss. (Kharazi, Hadi)
May 23, 2022 Filing 23 REPLY by Mark T. Oba, Nancy M. Oba re #22 Objections. (Kharazi, Hadi)
May 19, 2022 Filing 22 OBJECTIONS by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to #21 Request for Entry of Default. (Bevan, Eric)
May 17, 2022 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Steve Larsen, Stan Lee, Mac Samuels, Regina Tihfon, Earl Walter, Sophia Williams by Mark T. Oba, Nancy M. Oba. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed[ Entry of Default)(Kharazi, Hadi)
May 16, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Steve Larsen served on 3/28/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Kharazi, Hadi)
May 16, 2022 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Earl Walter served on 3/28/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Kharazi, Hadi)
May 16, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Mac Samuels served on 3/28/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Kharazi, Hadi)
May 16, 2022 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Regina Tihfon served on 3/28/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Kharazi, Hadi)
May 16, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sophia Williams served on 3/28/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Kharazi, Hadi)
May 16, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Stan Lee served on 3/28/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Kharazi, Hadi)
May 9, 2022 Filing 14 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Bank of America, N.A. in re #13 Motion to Dismiss,,. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF CATALINA JOOS VERGARA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, #2 PROPOSED ORDER ON DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA N.A.'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE)(Vergara, Catalina)
May 9, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to DISMISS by Bank of America, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Attachments: #1 DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, #2 [PROPOSED] ORDER ON DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA N.A.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(B)(6) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, #3 Proof of Service)(Vergara, Catalina)
May 9, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to DISMISS by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Bevan, Eric)
April 20, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jessica Brent on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. Attorney Brent, Jessica added. (Brent, Jessica)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) Upon this cased being reassigned (Doc. No. #9 ), the initial mandatory scheduling conference set for 7/14/2022 will be held telephonically at 1:00 pm before Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta. Per Doc. No. #7 , the parties must submit a joint scheduling report one week prior to the mandatory scheduling conference to hbkorders@caed.uscourts.gov. DIAL IN INFORMATION: 888-204-5984; PASSCODE: 4446176. Signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 04/07/2022. (Sena, Franceska)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of Recusal signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/06/2022. New Case Number: 1:22-cv-395 AWI-HBK. (Flores, E)
April 5, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by 28 Days (L.R. 144) by Bank of America, N.A.. (Vergara, Catalina)
April 5, 2022 Filing 7 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/5/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
April 4, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Bank of America, N.A. re #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Notice of Appearance, #5 Notice - Other. (Vergara, Catalina)
April 4, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE / Bank of America, N.A.'s Joinder in Notice of Removal of Action by Bank of America, N.A. re #1 Notice of Removal,. Attorney Vergara, Catalina Joos added. (Vergara, Catalina)
April 4, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Vergara, Catalina)
April 4, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by William K. Pao on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. Attorney Pao, William K. added. (Pao, William)
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Follett, Matthew)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Fresno, case number 22ECG00627 by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BCAEDC-10158547) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Composite Exhibit A), #2 Exhibit B (Nelson Declaration), #3 Exhibit C (Johnson Declaration), #4 Exhibit D (Bevan Declaration), #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proof of Service)(Follett, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oba et al v. Larsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy M. Oba
Represented By: Hadi Ty Kharazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark T. Oba
Represented By: Hadi Ty Kharazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mac Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sophia Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Tihfon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technosolis Informatics LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technocare Technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Eric Andrew Bevan
Represented By: Matthew R. Follett
Represented By: Amy Rubin, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Catalina Joos Vergara
Represented By: William K. Pao
Represented By: Jessica Brent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?