(PC) Crossley v. Cole et al
Plaintiff: Lamont Crossley
Defendant: J. Cole, J. Williams, M. Ross, H. Flores, L. Reyes and J. Cortez-BeDolla
Case Number: 1:2022cv00408
Filed: March 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: BakersfieldMJ
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Jessen, A)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #9 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/19/2022. (Jessen, A)
April 19, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Lamont Crossley. (Jessen, A)
April 18, 2022 Filing 11 This case has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Drozd and U.S. Magistrate Judge Bakersfield MJ; new case number is 1:22-cv-00408 DAD-BAK (PC) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 18, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: 11 Docket Annotation served on Lamont Crossley. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by BakersfieldMJ on 4/12/2022. (Marrujo, C)
April 12, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL: Due to the elevation of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is temporarily referred to *Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate judge is appointed. Documents filed in this case shall include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(SAB)* (Marrujo, C)
April 12, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Notice of Temporary Magistrate Judge Referral, served on Lamont Crossley. (Marrujo, C)
April 12, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Lamont Crossley. (Marrujo, C)
April 11, 2022 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 11, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Lamont Crossley. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 8, 2022 Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 5/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Yin, K)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:22-cv-0563 DB PC) to Fresno (1:22-cv-0408 BAK PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/7/2022; this court has not ruled on plaintiff's request to proceed ifp. (Yin, K)
April 8, 2022 Filing 4 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Lamont Crossley (Perdue, C.)
April 8, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #5 Transfer Order served on Lamont Crossley. (Yin, K)
April 6, 2022 CLERKS NOTICE (text only): The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Lamont Crossley, CDCR# K-82991 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Yin, K)
March 30, 2022 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *3/29/2022*. Consent or Decline due by 5/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Licea Chavez, V)
March 30, 2022 SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Lamont Crossley. (Licea Chavez, V)
March 29, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Lamont Crossley. (Licea Chavez, V)
March 29, 2022 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Licea Chavez, V)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Crossley v. Cole et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamont Crossley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Cortez-BeDolla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?