St. Jude Hospital, Inc. v. HCI Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: St. Jude Hospital, Inc. Doing business as Providence St. Jude Medical Center
Defendant: HCI Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00434
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2022 Filing 10 OPPOSITION by HCI Systems, Inc. to #8 Motion to Remand,. (Smith, Charles)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) The parties are advised that pursuant to the undersigned's standing order and Local Rule 230(g), the recently filed motion to remand #8 will be decided on the papers. No hearing will be calendared. Local Rule 230, as revised March 1, 2022, will govern the filing of oppositions and replies. The parties are further informed that as a result of the judicial resource emergency described in this Court's standing order re judicial emergency, more than 80 motions remain under submission in the caseload recently re-assigned to the undersigned. Although the Court has begun the process of working through this significant backlog, it may still be many months until the motion in this matter is resolved. The Court reiterates that magistrate judge consent may alleviate some of the delays caused by the resource emergency signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on May 18, 2022. (Munoz, I)
May 16, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to REMAND by St. Jude Hospital, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of P. Sharifi ISO Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Remand)(Sharifi, Pantea)
April 28, 2022 Filing 7 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by St. Jude Hospital, Inc.. (Sharifi, Pantea)
April 28, 2022 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff St. Jude Hospital, Inc.. (Sharifi, Pantea)
April 20, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER by HCI Systems, Inc..(Smith, Charles)
April 14, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET by HCI Systems, Inc. (Smith, Charles)
April 14, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Maldonado, C)
April 14, 2022 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Charles Gerard Smith re #1 Notice of Removal: Under Local Rule 3-200, every complaint, amended complaint, or other document initiating a civil action shall be accompanied by a completed civil cover sheet, on a form available from the Clerk and on the Court's website. Please file your civil cover sheet. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Flores, E)
April 14, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Stanislaus County Superior Court, case number CV-22-001044 by HCI Systems, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10177457) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Interested Party)(Smith, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Jude Hospital, Inc. v. HCI Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Jude Hospital, Inc. Doing business as Providence St. Jude Medical Center
Represented By: Pantea Rahnemoun Sharifi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCI Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Gerard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?