Marsh v. Bank of Sierra, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Terrance Marsh
Defendant: Bank of Sierra, Inc., Margaret Droese and Karen Mitchell
Case Number: 1:2022cv00508
Filed: May 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: BakersfieldMJ
Referring Judge: Christopher D Baker
2 Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry), signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 9/15/2023: Due to the pending motion to dismiss/strike, along with the ongoing judicial emergency and heavy caseload experienced by this district, the Scheduling Conference set for 9/25/2023 is CONTINUED to 1/17/2024 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield (CDB) before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. The parties shall appear at the conference remotely via Zoom video conference, and they may obtain the Zoom ID and password from the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. A joint scheduling conference statement shall be filed in compliance with the procedures set forth in the Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference (Doc. #24 ). (Hall, S)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to STRIKE Second Amended Complaint re #31 Motion to Dismiss,. by Bank of Sierra, Inc., Margaret Droese, Karen Mitchell. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Declaration Declaration of Matthew Backowski, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Backowski, Matthew)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to DISMISS by Bank of Sierra, Inc., Margaret Droese, Karen Mitchell. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Declaration Declaration of Matthew Backowski, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Backowski, Matthew)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 33 Minute Order served on Terrance Marsh. (Hall, S)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER on #29 Stipulation Extending Time for Filing Responsive Pleading, signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 9/7/2023. Responsive pleadings due by 9/15/2023. (Hall, S)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #30 Order served on Terrance Marsh. (Hall, S)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond by Bank of Sierra, Inc., Margaret Droese, Karen Mitchell. (Backowski, Matthew)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond by Bank of Sierra, Inc., Margaret Droese, Karen Mitchell. (Backowski, Matthew)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Backowski, Matthew)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Karen Mitchell on 6/30/2023, Answer due 8/29/2023. (Xiong, J.)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Bank of Sierra, Inc. on 6/30/2023 and Margaret Droese on 6/30/2023, Answer due 8/29/2023. (Xiong, J.)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/25/2023 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield (CDB) before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. (Attachments: #1 CDB Worksheet, #2 Standing Order, #3 Consent Form, #4 Informational Order) (Lundstrom, T)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER directing service by the U.S. Marshals Service without prepayment of costs 22 signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 6/29/2023. (Lundstrom, T)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #24 Civil New Case Documents for JLT, #23 Order served on Terrance Marsh. (Lundstrom, T)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS: 3 Summons, 3 USM-285 Forms, and 4 copies of the complaint, by Terrance Marsh. Pending order from chambers.(Marrujo, C)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISCHARGING #19 April 19, 2023, Order to Show Cause and GRANTING Plaintiff's #20 Request Nunc Pro Tunc for an Extension of Time for Service of the Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 5/11/2023. (Hall, S)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #21 Order served on Terrance Marsh. (Hall, S)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE to #19 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Terrance Marsh. (Rivera, O)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE in Writing Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Failure to Comply, signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 4/19/2023. Show Cause Response due within 21 days. (Hall, S)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #19 Order to Show Cause served on Terrance Marsh. (Hall, S)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SECOND ORDER for Service of Second Amended Complaint #12 signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 3/15/2023. 30-Day Filing Deadline. (Attachments: #1 USM Instructions); (Summons). (Lundstrom, T)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #18 Order and Service Documents served on Terrance Marsh. (Lundstrom, T)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS: 3 Summons, 3 USM-285 Forms, and 4 copies of the amended complaint by Terrance Marsh. (Lundstrom, T)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #16 Order served on Terrance Marsh. (Marrujo, C)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER for service of Second Amended Complaint #12 signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 2/8/2023. (Filing Deadline: 3/14/2023). (Attachments: #1 USM Instructions). (Lundstrom, T)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #16 Order and Service Documents, #12 Second Amended Complaint served on Terrance Marsh. (Lundstrom, T)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS and Dismissing Plaintiff's Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress Claim with prejudice #14 signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/6/2023. (Lundstrom, T)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Order served on Terrance Marsh. (Lundstrom, T)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 THIRD SCREENING ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Dismissing Plaintiff's Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress Claim, signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 12/30/2022. Referred to Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Hall, S)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Findings and Recommendations served on Terrance Marsh. (Hall, S)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker to the bench of the Eastern District of California, the court hereby reassigns this case from Bakersfield Magistrate Judge (BAK) to Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker for all further proceedings. (Lundstrom, T)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order Reassigning Magistrate Judge Baker, served on Terrance Marsh. (Lundstrom, T)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bank of Sierra, Inc., Margaret Droese, Karen Mitchell by Terrance Marsh.(Martin-Gill, S)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SECOND SCREENING ORDER; ORDER Finding Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Fails to State a Cognizable Federal Claim and GRANTING LEAVE to AMEND ADA Claim; ORDER DENYING #10 Motion for Reconsideration of Request to File Electronically, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/27/2022. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Hall, S)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Second Screening Order served on Terrance Marsh. (Hall, S)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Reconsideration of Electronic Filing by Terrance Marsh. (Hall, S)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bank of Sierra, Inc., Margaret Droese, Karen Mitchell by Terrance Marsh. (Hall, S)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FIRST SCREENING ORDER - Order for Plaintiff to: (1) File a First Amended Complaint; or (2) Notify the Court that He Wishes to Stand on His Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/12/2022. First Amended Complaint or Notice due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order served on Terrance Marsh. (Jessen, A)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING #4 Request for Permission to File Electronically, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/10/2022. (Hall, S)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Request served on Terrance Marsh. (Hall, S)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #3 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/3/2022. (Hall, S)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Proceed IFP served on Terrance Marsh. (Hall, S)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL: Due to the elevation of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is temporarily referred to *Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate judge is appointed. Documents filed in this case shall include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(SKO)* (Maldonado, C)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Maldonado, C)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 APPLICATION for Permission for Electronic Filing by Terrance Marsh. (Maldonado, C)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Terrance Marsh. (Maldonado, C)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DECLARATION of Gesele McBroom-Marsh. (Maldonado, C)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of Sierra, Inc., Margaret Droese, Karen Mitchell by Terrance Marsh.(Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marsh v. Bank of Sierra, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Sierra, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Backowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Droese
Represented By: Matthew Backowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew Backowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?