(SS) Medina v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Daniella Viviana Miranda Medina
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2022cv00519
Filed: May 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE: In accordance with the Social Security Scheduling Order in effect for cases filed on or after June 15, 2021, Defendant Commissioner of Social Security hereby acknowledges electronic service of the complaint through the Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel's designated email address on 6/1/2022. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Social Security Admin- SS E-Service, )
May 4, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Benavides, Francesco)
May 3, 2022 Filing 6 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Social Security Complaint, #4 Summons, #5 Social Security New Case Documents for MJ as Presider served on Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to E-Service Agreement. (Maldonado, C)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 8/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Maldonado, C)
May 3, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Francesco Paulo Benavides* *1990 N. California Blvd.* *Suite 20, PMB 1038* *Walnut Creek, CA 94596*. (Maldonado, C)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Directing Clerk to Issue New Case Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 05/03/2022. (Maldonado, C)
May 2, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Daniella Viviana Miranda Medina. (Benavides, Francesco)
May 2, 2022 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Daniella Viviana Miranda Medina. Attorney Benavides, Francesco Paulo added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benavides, Francesco)
May 2, 2022 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Medina v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniella Viviana Miranda Medina
Represented By: Francesco Paulo Benavides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Admin- SS E-Service
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?