Ramirez v. Merrill Gardens, LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Maria Bustos Ramirez
Defendant: Merrill Gardens, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00542
Filed: May 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Merrill Gardens, LLC by Maria Bustos Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tunyan, Lilit)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE: STIPULATED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/14/2022. (Gonzales, V)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Maria Bustos Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Tunyan, Lilit)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF ORDER SETTING MANDATORY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Maria Bustos Ramirez re #17 Civil New Case Documents for DAD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tunyan, Lilit)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/18/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 2:22-cv-02584.
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE U.S. DISTRICT COURT, EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA #14 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case electronically sent to USDC Eastern California on 5/5/2022.(MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) [Transferred from cacd on 5/5/2022.]
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court, Eastern District Court of California filed by Plaintiff Maria Bustos Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Transfer Venue)(Tunyan, Lilit) [Transferred from cacd on 5/5/2022.]
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Merrill Gardens, LLC's Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Amended Answer. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) [Transferred from cacd on 5/5/2022.]
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) DEFENDANT MERRILL GARDENS LLCs AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Merrill Gardens, LLC.(Botros, Samantha) [Transferred from cacd on 5/5/2022.]
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE filed by Plaintiff Maria Bustos Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tunyan, Lilit) [Transferred from cacd on 5/5/2022.]
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Proof of service (Subsequent Documents) (filing was to Notice of Removal. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) [Transferred from cacd on 5/5/2022.]
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for June 6, 2022 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II. (lc) [Transferred from cacd on 5/5/2022.]
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerks Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc) Modified on 4/20/2022 (lc). [Transferred from cacd on 5/5/2022.]
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE filed by Defendant Merrill Gardens, LLC. Certificate of Service by Overnight Mail re Ntc of Removal (O'Malley, Diane) [Transferred from cacd on 5/5/2022.]
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 5/5/2022.]
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 5/5/2022.]
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 5/5/2022.]
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Merrill Gardens, LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Maria Bustos Ramirez. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/8/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 5/5/2022.]
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Maria Bustos Ramirez, upon Defendant Merrill Gardens, LLC served on 3/18/2022, answer due 4/8/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service of Process by serving Sarahi Marin, Intake Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/1/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B) (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 5/5/2022.]
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Merrill Gardens, LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C)(ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 5/5/2022.]
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Statement of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Merrill Gardens, LLC, identifying None. (O'Malley, Diane) [Transferred from cacd on 5/5/2022.]
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Merrill Gardens, LLC. (O'Malley, Diane) [Transferred from cacd on 5/5/2022.]
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 22STCV08363 Receipt No: ACACDC-33148484 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Merrill Gardens, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Attorney Diane Marie O'Malley added to party Merrill Gardens, LLC(pty:dft))(O'Malley, Diane) [Transferred from cacd on 5/5/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Merrill Gardens, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Bustos Ramirez
Represented By: Kane Moon
Represented By: Lilit Tunyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Gardens, LLC
Represented By: Diane Marie O'Malley
Represented By: Samantha A. Botros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?