(PC) Ramirez v. Perez et al
Plaintiff: Israel Ramirez
Defendant: Perez, Khale, Morales, Debie, John and Joe
Case Number: 1:2022cv00564
Filed: May 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Israel Ramirez.(Marrujo, C)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING #9 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING #7 Motion for Immediate Release From Prison, signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/16/2022. (Marrujo, C)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, served on Israel Ramirez. (Marrujo, C)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's #13 Motion Regarding Filing Fee Payment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/13/2022. (Marrujo, C)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Order on Motion served on Israel Ramirez. (Marrujo, C)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION by Israel Ramirez. (Marrujo, C)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OBJECTIONS/Response to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #9 by Plaintiff Israel Ramirez. (Marrujo, C)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER discharging Order to Show Cause and directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within 30-Days #5 , #7 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Form). (Lundstrom, T)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order served on Israel Ramirez. (Lundstrom, T)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE to #5 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Israel Ramirez. (Lundstrom, T)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that #7 Plaintiff's Motion for Immediate Release From Incarceration be Denied re #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/31/2022. Referred to Judge Thurston. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Findings and Recommendations served on Israel Ramirez. (Jessen, A)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is: 1:22-cv-564 JLT-SAB. (Flores, E)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Israel Ramirez. (Flores, E)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Emergency Relief by Israel Ramirez. (Flores, E)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Flores, E)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not be Dismissed Without Prejudice for Failure to Exhaust the Administrative Remedies signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/19/2022. Show Cause Response due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order to Show Cause served on Israel Ramirez. (Jessen, A)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (60-Day Deadline)(Copy of IFP and this order mailed to Madera County Sheriff)(Martin-Gill, S)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Israel Ramirez. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 6/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Flores, E)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Israel Ramirez. (Flores, E)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Israel Ramirez. (Flores, E)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Debie, Joe, John, Khale, Morales, Perez by Israel Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Ramirez v. Perez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?