Foreman et al v. District Attorney of Bakersfield
Plaintiff: Trevon Foreman and Lotisha Davidson
Defendant: District Attorney of Bakersfield
Case Number: 1:2022cv00581
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: BakersfieldMJ
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action Should Not Be Recommended for Dismissal for Plaintiff Foreman's Failure to Comply with the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/24/2022. Show Cause Response due within 21 days. (Hall, S)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order to Show Cause served on Lotisha Davidson and Trevon Foreman. (Hall, S)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Flores, E)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Lotisha Davidson. (Flores, E)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING Plaintiffs to pay the $402.00 filing fee or each submit a completed IFP Application within 30-Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Lundstrom, T)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Lotisha Davidson and Trevon Foreman. (Lundstrom, T)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL: Due to the elevation of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is temporarily referred to *Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate judge is appointed. Documents filed in this case shall include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(SKO)* (Lundstrom, T)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Notice of Temporary Magistrate Judge Referral, #1 Complaint served on Lotisha Davidson, Trevon Foreman. (Lundstrom, T)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required.. (Lundstrom, T)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Trevon Foreman. (Lundstrom, T)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against District Attorney of Bakersfield by Trevon Foreman, Lotisha Davidson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lundstrom, T) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foreman et al v. District Attorney of Bakersfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevon Foreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lotisha Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Attorney of Bakersfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?