Peterson et al v. Thomson International, Incorporated
Plaintiff: Matthew Peterson, Sadie Floding, Colin Strub, Brenda Carson, Jody Barry, Teischa Benson, Lynnetta Klam and Lori Davies
Defendant: Thomson International, Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2022cv00701
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: BakersfieldMJ
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #11 Application for Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/8/2022. Added attorney Lindsay Lien Rinholen, PHV for Jody Barry, Teischa Benson, Brenda Carson, Lori Davies, Sadie Floding, Lynnetta Klam, Matthew Peterson, Colin Strub. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Lawrence, A)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #10 Application for Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/8/2022. Added attorney Ryan Osterholm, PHV for Jody Barry, Teischa Benson, Brenda Carson, Lori Davies, Sadie Floding, Lynnetta Klam, Matthew Peterson, Colin Strub. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Lawrence, A)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REQUIRING Parties to Show Cause in Writing Why Cases Should Not Be Related; ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/8/2022. Show Cause Response due by 8/12/2022. Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 9/8/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Hall, S)
August 5, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Thomson International, Incorporated on 6/22/2022, Answer due 8/22/2022 (Gruber, Eric)
August 5, 2022 Filing 11 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Jody Barry, Teischa Benson, Brenda Carson, Lori Davies, Sadie Floding, Lynnetta Klam, Matthew Peterson, Colin Strub for attorney Lindsay Lien Rinholen to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10367040) (Gruber, Eric)
August 5, 2022 Filing 10 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Teischa Benson, Brenda Carson, Lori Davies, Sadie Floding, Lynnetta Klam, Matthew Peterson, Colin Strub for attorney Ryan Osterholm to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10366955) (Gruber, Eric)
August 4, 2022 Filing 9 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Thomson International, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Scheduling Conference Worksheet)(Sallander, Robert)
July 6, 2022 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and BakersfieldMJ. The new case number is: 1:22-cv-00701-DAD-BAK. (Marrujo, C)
July 5, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Thomson International, Incorporated. (Sallander, Robert)
July 5, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Thomson International, Incorporated.(Sallander, Robert)
July 5, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Sallander, Robert)
June 10, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/18/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A(m), #2 Worksheet, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL: Due to the elevation of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is temporarily referred to *Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate judge is appointed. Documents filed in this case shall include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(SAB)* (Marrujo, C)
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Thomson International, Incorporated* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Eric R Gruber* *Gruber Law Group* *770 L Street, Suite 950* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Marrujo, C)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by JODY BARRY, SADIE FLODING, TEISCHA BENSON, LORI DAVIES, MATTHEW PETERSON, LYNNETTA KLAM, COLIN STRUB, BRENDA CARSON. Attorney Gruber, Eric R added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10274221) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Gruber, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson et al v. Thomson International, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Peterson
Represented By: Eric R Gruber
Represented By: Lindsay Lien Rinholen, PHV
Represented By: Ryan Osterholm, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sadie Floding
Represented By: Eric R Gruber
Represented By: Lindsay Lien Rinholen, PHV
Represented By: Ryan Osterholm, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin Strub
Represented By: Eric R Gruber
Represented By: Lindsay Lien Rinholen, PHV
Represented By: Ryan Osterholm, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Carson
Represented By: Eric R Gruber
Represented By: Lindsay Lien Rinholen, PHV
Represented By: Ryan Osterholm, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Barry
Represented By: Eric R Gruber
Represented By: Lindsay Lien Rinholen, PHV
Represented By: Ryan Osterholm, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teischa Benson
Represented By: Eric R Gruber
Represented By: Lindsay Lien Rinholen, PHV
Represented By: Ryan Osterholm, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynnetta Klam
Represented By: Eric R Gruber
Represented By: Lindsay Lien Rinholen, PHV
Represented By: Ryan Osterholm, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Davies
Represented By: Eric R Gruber
Represented By: Lindsay Lien Rinholen, PHV
Represented By: Ryan Osterholm, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomson International, Incorporated
Represented By: Robert L. Sallander, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?