Cole et al v. Quest Diagnostics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Angela Cole and Beatrice Roche
Defendant: Quest Diagnostics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00892
Filed: July 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2022 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Quest Diagnostics, Inc.. (Wilhelm, Zoe)
August 29, 2022 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Joint Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint by Quest Diagnostics, Inc.. Attorney Wilhelm, Zoe K. added. (Wilhelm, Zoe)
August 19, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Quest Diagnostics, Inc. served on 8/16/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (Fisher, Lawrence)
July 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by John J. Nelson on behalf of Angela Cole, Beatrice Roche. Attorney Nelson, John J. added. (Nelson, John)
July 20, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
July 20, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Quest Diagnostics, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Lawrence Timothy Fisher* *1990 N. California Blvd.* *Suite 940* *Walnut Creek, CA 94596*. (Sant Agata, S)
July 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Quest Diagnostics, Inc. by Angela Cole, Beatrice Roche. Attorney Fisher, Lawrence Timothy added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10336860) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisher, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole et al v. Quest Diagnostics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Cole
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: John J. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatrice Roche
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: John J. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Diagnostics, Inc.
Represented By: Zoe K. Wilhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?