(PC) Figueroa v. Clark. et al.
Plaintiff: Ruben Figueroa
Defendant: Ken Clark, Paul Silva, Susan Doherty, Linda Ortega and Adrian Jaques
Case Number: 1:2022cv00916
Filed: July 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCREENING ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/24/2022. Amended Complaint due within THIRTY DAYS. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form)(Marrujo, C)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order Dismissing Case with Leave to Amend served on Ruben Figueroa. (Marrujo, C)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Lundstrom, T)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Ruben Figueroa. (Lundstrom, T)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Ruben Figueroa. (Lundstrom, T)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 8/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Lundstrom, T)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Ruben Figueroa. (Lundstrom, T)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Ken Clark, Susan Doherty, Adrian Jaques, Linda Ortega, Paul Silva by Ruben Figueroa.(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Figueroa v. Clark. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Jaques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?