Smith v. United States of America, et al.
Plaintiff: Stephen A. Smith
Defendant: United States of America, Department of Treasury and Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 1:2022cv01032
Filed: August 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for the United States to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 and Continue Preliminary Scheduling Conference #5 by United States of America. (Hlinka, Morgan Blair)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Morgan Blair Hlinka, GOVT on behalf of Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, United States of America. Attorney Hlinka, Morgan Blair added. (Hlinka, Morgan Blair)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SEALED EVENT. (Flores, E)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REQUEST for Request to File Documents Under Seal and Request to Modify Order by Stephen A. Smith. (Houghton, Craig)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DECLARATION of Stephen A. Smith re #16 Request. (Houghton, Craig)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REQUEST for Request to File Document Under Seal by Stephen A. Smith. (Houghton, Craig)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE: #14 Request to File Documents under Seal and Request to Modify Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/25/2022. (Flores, E)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by Stephen A. Smith. (Houghton, Craig)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SEALED EVENT. (Flores, E)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Plaintiff's Request to Seal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/18/2022. (Lawrence, A)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by Stephen A. Smith. (Houghton, Craig)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Stephen A. Smith re #5 Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider. (Houghton, Craig)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Stephen A. Smith. (Houghton, Craig)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Stephen A. Smith. Internal Revenue Service served on 8/17/2022, answer due 10/17/2022. (Houghton, Craig)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Stephen A. Smith. United States of America served on 8/17/2022, answer due 10/17/2022. (Houghton, Craig)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Stephen A. Smith. Department of Treasury served on 8/17/2022, answer due 10/17/2022. (Houghton, Craig)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A(m), #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Maldonado, C)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, United States of America* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Craig A. Houghton* *5260 North Palm Avenue, Suite 201* *Fresno, CA 93704*. (Maldonado, C)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Stephen A. Smith, Special Administrator of Estate of Sharleen G. Robson and Estate of Robert W. Robson (Houghton, Craig)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney, Craig Alan Houghton regarding Civil Cover Sheet. Under Local Rule 200, every complaint, amended complaint, or other document initiating a civil action shall be accompanied by a completed civil cover sheet, on a form available from the Clerk and on the Court's website. Please file your civil cover sheet. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444. (Lundstrom, T)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Refund of Tax against All Defendants by Stephen A. Smith, Special Administrator of Estate of Sharleen G. Robson and Estate of Robert W. Robson. Attorney Houghton, Craig Alan added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10383676) (Houghton, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. United States of America, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen A. Smith
Represented By: Dirk B. Paloutzian
Represented By: Craig Alan Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Morgan Blair Hlinka, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Treasury
Represented By: Morgan Blair Hlinka, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Morgan Blair Hlinka, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?