Alford v. USA
Plaintiff: Mark Alford
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2022cv01056
Filed: August 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: BakersfieldMJ
Referring Judge: Ana de Alba
2 Judge: Christopher D Baker
3 Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker to the bench of the Eastern District of California, the court hereby reassigns this case from Bakersfield Magistrate Judge (BAK) to Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker for all further proceedings. (Marrujo, C)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of *District Judge Ana de Alba* to the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned from *District Judge Dale A. Drozd* to District Judge Ana de Alba for all further proceedings. (Apodaca, P)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Worksheet, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Flores, E)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL: Due to the elevation of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is temporarily referred to *Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate judge is appointed. Documents filed in this case shall include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(BAM)* (Flores, E)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States of America* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Justin Alan Morello* *Morello Law, P.C.* *3170 Fourth Ave, Suite 250* *San Diego, CA 92103*. (Flores, E)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for damages and jury demand against United States Department of Health and Human Services by Mark Alford. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10391500) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morello, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alford v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Alford
Represented By: Justin Alan Morello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?