(PC) Steele v. All Ye Judges of the Courts et al
Plaintiff: Rebekah Sue Steele
Defendant: All Ye Judges of the Courts, All Ye Government Agencies, Medical Board Members of Health Care and Reforms State Hospital and All officials of Unjust Justice Systems
Case Number: 1:2022cv01117
Filed: August 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Rebekah Sue Steele. (Rivera, O)
October 20, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief by Rebekah Sue Steele. (Rivera, O)
October 20, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION and Lawsuit for Restoration of Competency and Enter Plea of not Guilty to all Charges and Special Allegations by Rebekah Sue Steele. (Flores, E)
October 17, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Dismissal of Inmate by Rebekah Sue Steele. (Flores, E)
October 17, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Investigation by Rebekah Sue Steele. (Flores, E)
October 12, 2022 Filing 16 PLAINTIFF'S ADDRESS UPDATED to 1048 Jeff Tuttle Drive, San Andres, CA 95494, Pursuant to #15 Motion filed on 10/11/2022. (Flores, E)
October 12, 2022 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #13 Order, #10 Order served on Rebekah Sue Steele. (Flores, E)
October 11, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION: Appeal of Fourth Denial of Marisden and Request for Appointment of Counsel by Rebekah Sue Steele. (Flores, E)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER to Submit a Non-Prisoner Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on the Court's Form or Pay the $402.00 Filing Fee, within Thirty Days; ORDER for Clerk to Send Plaintiff a Non-Prisoner Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Form signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/11/2022. Motion for IFP due within Thirty-Days. (Attachments: #1 Non-Prisoner IFP Application)(Flores, E)
October 11, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order served on Rebekah Sue Steele. (Flores, E)
October 11, 2022 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Return to Sender, No Mail Receptable, Unable to Forward: #9 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief sent to Rabekah Sue Steele. (Flores, E)
October 7, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Court Order by Rebekah Sue Steele. (Flores, E)
September 28, 2022 Filing 12 COPY of Motion to Supreme Court filed by Plaintiff Rebekah Sue Steele. (Sant Agata, S)
September 28, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #10 Order by Rebekah Sue Steele. (Sant Agata, S)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to submit a non-prisoner Application to proceed In Forma Pauperis or pay the $402.00 filing fee within 30-Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Lundstrom, T)
September 15, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order served on Rebekah Sue Steele. (Lundstrom, T)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER STRIKING #7 Motion for lack of signature signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/13/2022. (Lundstrom, T)
September 13, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order served on Rebekah Sue Steele. (Lundstrom, T)
September 12, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to 1718 Monge Ranch Rd, Vallecito, CA 95251 by Rebekah Sue Steele. (Lundstrom, T)
September 12, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION by Rebekah Sue Steele. (Lundstrom, T)
September 12, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lundstrom, T)
September 8, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lundstrom, T)
September 2, 2022 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 10/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Huang, H)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:22-cv-1503-DB) to Fresno (1:22-cv-1117-GSA) signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/1/2022. (Huang, H)
September 2, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Intradistrict Transfer Order #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, served on Rebekah Sue Steele. (Huang, H)
August 26, 2022 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 9/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Licea Chavez, V)
August 26, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Rebekah Sue Steele. (Licea Chavez, V)
August 25, 2022 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Ye Government Agencies, All Ye Judges of the Courts, All officials of Unjust Justice Systems, Medical Board Members of Health Care and Reforms State Hospital by Rebekah Sue Steele.(Licea Chavez, V)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Steele v. All Ye Judges of the Courts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebekah Sue Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Ye Judges of the Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Ye Government Agencies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Board Members of Health Care and Reforms State Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All officials of Unjust Justice Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?